Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
12/22/2009 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice Re Settlement Conference Program and Suspension of Rules mailed to all counsel. (The requesting of transcripts and briefing are stayed pursuant to NRAP 16(a)(1). Docketing Statement Form mailed to counsel for appellant(s).) | | 09-30934 |
12/22/2009 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee due. Filing fee will be fowarded by the District Court. | | |
12/23/2009 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from White Law Chartered check no. 12839. | | |
12/28/2009 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Carolyn Worrell | | 09-31320 |
01/04/2010 | Motion | Filed Motion to Dismiss Appeal. Respondents' Motion to Dismiss. | | 10-00166 |
01/08/2010 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | | 10-00707 |
01/08/2010 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Provide Proof of Service on Settlement Judge. - Docketing Statement. | | 10-00708 |
01/12/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Denying Motion. We deny the motion of respondent Guardianship Services to dismiss this appeal. This denial is without prejudice to respondent's right to renew the motion upon completion of settlement proceedings. | | 10-00978 |
01/14/2010 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proof of Service. -Docketing Statement Served on Settlement Judge. | | 10-01229 |
02/12/2010 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This matter is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference will be scheduled. | | 10-03918 |
04/09/2010 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Not Appropriate for Settlement Program. 55104 and 55354. The settlement judge recommends this matter be removed from the settlement program. | | 10-09392 |
04/15/2010 | Settlement Order/Procedural | Order Removing From Settlement Program/Briefing Reinstated. Consolidating Appeals and Reinstating Briefing.These appeals are removed from the settlement conference program. We consolidate these appeals. Transcript request due: 15 days. Single opening brief due: 90 days. 55104/55354 | | 10-09812 |
05/07/2010 | Motion | Filed Motion for Stay. To Stay Further Proceedings Until Movant's March 4, 2010 Motion to Reinstate Appeals in Cases 53099 & 53695 is Decided. Nos. 55104/55354. | | 10-11807 |
05/13/2010 | Motion | Filed Response to Motion. Respondent Guardianship Services of Nevada, Inc.'s Opposition to Motion to Stay Further Proceedings in These Appeals Until Movant's March 4, 2010 Motion to Reinstate Appeals in Cases 53099 and 53695. Nos. 55104/55354 | | 10-12501 |
05/17/2010 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Joinder. The Lucille Mixer Revocable Trust's Joinder in Guardianship Services of Nevada's Opposition to Appellant's Motion to Stay Further Proceedings in These Appeals until Movant's March 4, 2010. Nos. 55104/55354. (10-12800) | | |
06/11/2010 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 08/11/09. To Court Reporter: Pam Longoni. Nos. 55104/55354. | | 10-15190 |
06/28/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Denying Stay as Moot. Nos. 55104/55354. | | 10-16746 |
07/12/2010 | Motion | Filed Motion to Dismiss Appeal. Nos. 55104/55354. | | 10-17861 |
07/20/2010 | Motion | Filed Motion for Excess Pages. Opening Brief. Total (39) pages. Nos. 55104/55354. | | 10-18585 |
07/20/2010 | Notice/Outgoing | Filed Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. The motion for excess pages for the Opening Brief is approved. 39 pages granted. Nos. 55104/55354. | | 10-18587 |
07/20/2010 | Brief | Filed Opening Brief. Nos. 55104/55354. | | 10-18588 |
07/20/2010 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. Volume 1. Nos. 55104/55354. | | 10-18589 |
07/20/2010 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. Volume 2. Nos. 55104/55354. | | 10-18592 |
07/20/2010 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. Volume 3. Nos. 55104/55354. | | 10-18593 |
07/20/2010 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. Volume 4. Nos. 55104/55354. | | 10-18598 |
07/20/2010 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. Volume 5. Nos. 55104/55354. | | 10-18599 |
07/21/2010 | Motion | Filed Response to Motion. Appellant's Opposition to Motion to Dismiss. Nos. 55104/55354. | | 10-18863 |
07/29/2010 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Joinder. The Lucille Mixer Revocable Trust's Joinder in Guardianship Services of Nevada's Motion to Dismiss. Nos. 55104/55354. | | 10-19623 |
07/30/2010 | Motion | Filed Response to Motion. Respondents' Joint Reply to the Opposition to Motion to Dismiss Appeal. Nos. 55104/55354. | | 10-19754 |
08/09/2010 | Brief | Filed Answering Brief. Respondent Guardianship Services of Nevada, Inc.'s Answering Brief. Nos. 55104/55354. | | 10-20583 |
08/09/2010 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Answering Brief. Respondents' Joint Appendix Vol. I. Nos. 55104/55354. | | 10-20585 |
08/10/2010 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Answering Brief. Respondents' Joint Appendix Vol. II. Nos. 55104/55354. | | 10-20586 |
08/10/2010 | Brief | Filed Answering Brief. Respondent Successor Trustee Betty Bryant's Answering Brief. Nos. 55104/55354. | | 10-20589 |
08/10/2010 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Answering Brief. Respondent's Joint Appendix Vol. III. Nos. 55104/55354. | | 10-20612 |
09/10/2010 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Reply To Respondent Successor Trustee Betty Bryant's Answering Brief. Nos. 55104/55354. | | 10-23340 |
09/14/2010 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Reply Brief in Reply to Respondent Guardianship Services of Nevada, Inc's Answering Brief. Nos. 55104/55354. | | 10-23561 |
09/14/2010 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Supplemental Appendix (Volume VII). Nos. 55104/55354. | | 10-23560 |
09/14/2010 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Certificate of Service of Appellant's Supplemental Appendix. Nos. 55104/55354. | | 10-23562 |
09/14/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Denying Motion to Dismiss. Having considered the motion, joinder thereto, the opposition, and reply, the motion to dismiss is denied. Nos. 55104/55354. | | 10-23578 |
09/15/2010 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Request to File Corrected Opening Brief and Appendix. Nos. 55104/55354. | | 10-23759 |
09/15/2010 | Motion | Filed Motion-Appellant's Request to File Corrected Opening Brief and Appendix. Nos. 55104/55354. | | 10-23767 |
09/20/2010 | Motion | Filed Response to Motion-Respondent Guardianship Services Of Nevada, Inc.'S Non-Opposition To Appellant's Request To File Correct Opening Brief And Appendix. Nos. 55104/55354. | | 10-24090 |
10/08/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion to File Amended Opening Brief and Appendix. The clerk of this court shall file the amended opening brief and appendix received on September 15, 2010. Nos. 55104/55354. | | 10-26307 |
10/08/2010 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Corrected Opening Brief. Nos. 55104/55354. | | 10-26308 |
10/08/2010 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief - Appellant's Corrected Appendix Volume I. Nos. 55104/55354. | | 10-26309 |
10/08/2010 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief - Appellant's Corrected Appendix, Volume II. Nos. 55104/55354. | | 10-26310 |
10/08/2010 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief - Appellant's Corrected Appendix, Volume III. Nos. 55104/55354. | | 10-26311 |
10/08/2010 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief - Appellant's Corrected Appendix, Volume IV. Nos. 55104/55354. | | 10-26312 |
10/08/2010 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief - Appellant's Corrected Appendix, Volume V. Nos. 55104/55354. | | 10-26313 |
12/29/2010 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice. Suggestion of Death Upon the Record. Nos. 55104/55354. | | 10-33963 |
01/04/2011 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order to Show Cause. Appellant's counsel shall have 30 days from the date of this order to file a response addressing whether this matter is moot. Respondents may file any reply within 15 days from the date that the response is served. | | 11-00385 |
02/03/2011 | Motion | Filed Response to Order to Show Cause. Appellant's Response to Order to Show Cause Why Appeal is Not Moot. Nos. 55104/55354. | | 11-03554 |
02/04/2011 | Appendix | Filed Appendix. Appellant's Appendix to Appellant's Response to Order to Show Cause Why Appeal Is Not Moot. Nos. 55104/55354. | | 11-03557 |
02/10/2011 | Motion | Filed Appellee Guardianship Services of Nevada, Inc.'s Reply to "Appellant's Response to Order to Show Cause Why Appeal is not Moot." | | 11-04341 |
02/14/2011 | Notice/Incoming | Filed The Lucille Mixer Revocable Trust's Joinder in Guardianship Services of Nevada's Reply to Appellant's Response to Order to Show Cause Why Appeal is not Moot. | | 11-04828 |
03/18/2011 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Regarding Status of Appeal. Response from appellant due 30 days. | | 11-08466 |
04/01/2011 | Motion | Filed Motion to Substitute as Appellant Vicki Cliff, Special Administrator of the Estate of Clifford R. Mixer. | | 11-09892 |
04/18/2011 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion to Substitute. The clerk of this court shall amend the caption on this court's docket to reflect that the appellant in this appeal is "Vicki Cliff, Special Administrator of the Estate of Clifford R. Mixer, Deceased." | | 11-11503 |
06/17/2011 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Directing Clerk to Schedule Oral Argument. The clerk of this court is directed to schedule these matters for oral argument before the panel on the next available calendar. The argument shall be limited to 30 minutes. Nos. 55104/55354 | | 11-18117 |
07/13/2011 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral argument is scheduled for September 7, 2011 at 10:00 a.m. for 30 minutes in Carson City before the En Banc Court. Nos. 55104/55354. | | 11-21072 |
08/03/2011 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order instructing counsel to prepare to discuss specific issues during oral argument. Nos. 55104/55354. | | 11-23377 |
08/25/2011 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. Nos. 55104/55354. | | 11-26024 |
09/07/2011 | Case Status Update | Oral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before the En Banc Court. | | |
12/20/2011 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Reversal and Remand. "ORDER the judgment of the district court REVERSED AND REMAND this matter to the district court for proceedings consistent with this order." Nos. 55104/55354 | | 11-39223 |
01/17/2012 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | | 12-01561 |
01/17/2012 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | | |
01/24/2012 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on January 20, 2012. Nos. 55104/55354 | | 12-01561 |