Case Information: 55103 | |||
Short Caption: | ADLER VS. STANKO | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CV0901608 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - General - Other |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Disposition Filed/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | 12/22/2009 / Shipman, Madelyn | SP Status: | Completed |
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
12/17/2009 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice Re Settlement Conference Program and Suspension of Rules mailed to all counsel. (The requesting of transcripts and briefing are stayed pursuant to NRAP 16(a)(1). Docketing Statement Form mailed to counsel for appellant(s).) | 09-30643 | |
12/17/2009 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee due. Filing fee will be fowarded by the District Court. | ||
12/21/2009 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Ken McKenna - check no. 0240. | ||
12/22/2009 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Madelyn Shipman | 09-31042 | |
01/06/2010 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | 10-00311 | |
01/14/2010 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled. | 10-01215 | |
05/10/2010 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. | 10-12131 | |
05/11/2010 | Settlement Order/Procedural | Filed Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellant: 15 days to request transcripts; 90 days to file and serve opening brief and appendix. | 10-12271 | |
05/26/2010 | Transcript Request | Filed Certificate of No Transcript Request. | 10-13687 | |
08/05/2010 | Motion | Filed Stipulation/Dismiss Appeal. Stipulation to Dismiss with Prejudice. | 10-20252 | |
08/18/2010 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Stipulated Dismissal. Having reviewed the stipulation of the parties filed on August 5, 2010, " . . . this appeal is hereby dismissed." The parties shall bear their own costs and attorney fees. NRAP 42(b). CLK- SNP-HC | 10-21232 | |
08/18/2010 | Case Status Update | Case Closed. No remittitur issued. |