Case Information: 55098 | |||
Short Caption: | DOTTON (JOMONT) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C247125 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Other |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
12/16/2009 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) | 09-30576 | |
12/16/2009 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
01/05/2010 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice. Notice of Compliance re Filing of Rough Draft Transcript of Proceedings Relevant to Appeal. (Attached is the Request for Rough Draft Transcripts). | 10-00237 | |
02/02/2010 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to File Fast Track Statement and Appendix. Due date: 10 days. | 10-02794 | |
02/11/2010 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Statement. | 10-03764 | |
02/11/2010 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Statement. | ||
03/03/2010 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Response. | 10-05604 | |
03/03/2010 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Response. | 10-05605 | |
06/09/2010 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." NNP10-MC/NS/MG | 10-14734 | |
07/06/2010 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 10-15786 | |
07/06/2010 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
07/15/2010 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on July 9, 2010. | 10-15786 |