Case Information: 55095 | |||
Short Caption: | WOODARD (RICHARD) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C247020 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 04/14/2010 | How Submitted: | On Record |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
12/16/2009 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
12/16/2009 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | 09-30558 | |
12/23/2009 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Transmit Record. Record due: 120 days. | 09-31092 | |
04/14/2010 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal Copy. | 10-09709 | |
04/14/2010 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
05/20/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Directing of Supplemental Record on Appeal. Due: 40 days. | 10-13121 | |
06/04/2010 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Lisa Lizotte stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 1/15/09. | 10-14387 | |
06/17/2010 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Kiara Schmidt stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 08/27/08. | 10-15831 | |
06/24/2010 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal Copy. | 10-16557 | |
07/13/2010 | Other | Returned Mail. Rec for Docs 6/24/10 addressed to Richard Woodward. Per USPS, "return to sender, attempted not known, unable to forward". | 10-17943 | |
09/13/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Directing Response. We direct the Attorney General to, within 30 days from the date of this order, file a response indicating whether appellant has expired his sentence and, if so, to provide appropriate documentation. | 10-23376 | |
09/15/2010 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Appearance. Representing respondent: Alicia L. Lerud/Deputy Attorney General. | 10-23719 | |
10/06/2010 | Motion | Filed Response to Order to Show Cause. | 10-25884 | |
11/08/2010 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." Fn2 [We have received all documents that appellant has submitted in proper person to the clerk of this court in this matter, and we conclude that no relief based upon those submissions is warranted.] | 10-29155 | |
12/03/2010 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 10-31411 | |
12/03/2010 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
12/21/2010 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on December 9, 2010. | 10-31411 |