judyrecords
search tips
750 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals Record

Armando De Diego v. Al Dodds

Case: 05-23-00289-CV
05-23-00289-CV
03/28/2023
Insurance
Armando De Diego
Al Dodds
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event Type Description Document
02/23/2024Amended brief filedAppellant
02/22/2024Amended brief receivedAppellant
12/11/2023Brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellant
08/31/2023Letter brief filedAppellee
07/28/2023Letter brief filedAppellant
Case Events
Date Event Type Disposition Document
02/23/2024Amended brief filed
02/23/2024Motion to file amended brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
02/22/2024Amended brief received
02/22/2024Motion to file amended brief filed
02/12/2024Order enteredMotion or Writ Granted
02/09/2024Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
02/09/2024Appellees brief due
02/06/2024Electronic Supplemental Reporter/Recorders Record Filed
02/05/2024Electronic Supplemental Clerks Record Filed
02/05/2024Electronic Supplemental Clerks Record Filed
01/23/2024Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
01/10/2024Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
01/10/2024Appellees brief due
12/11/2023Brief filed - oral argument requested
12/11/2023Electronic Supplemental Reporter/Recorders Record Filed
12/11/2023Appellants brief due
11/11/2023Appellants brief due
11/10/2023Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
11/09/2023Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
10/13/2023Supplemental clerks record due
10/12/2023Electronic Supplemental Clerks Record Filed
10/10/2023Order enteredOtherwise Disposed
10/02/2023Letter received
09/29/2023Response filed
09/29/2023Supplemental clerks record due
09/26/2023Letter received
09/22/2023Order enteredOtherwise Disposed
09/11/2023Supplemental clerks record due
09/06/2023Letter issued by the court
08/31/2023Letter brief filed
08/18/2023Response due regarding jurisdiction
08/11/2023Appellants brief due
08/08/2023Response filed
08/07/2023Response due regarding jurisdiction
07/31/2023Response due regarding jurisdiction
07/28/2023Letter brief filed
07/28/2023Corrected document requested
07/19/2023Letter issued by the court for lack of jurisdiction or defect
07/12/2023Electronic Clerks Record Filed
07/06/2023No payment arrangements made with trial court clerk for record
07/06/2023Letter received
07/06/2023Reporters record due
07/01/2023Clerks record due
06/22/2023Additional copies of documents received after initial filing
06/22/2023Electronic Supplemental Reporter/Recorders Record Filed
06/21/2023Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed
06/21/2023Order enteredOtherwise Disposed
05/02/2023No clerks record filed in civil case
05/02/2023No reporters record filed in civil case
04/28/2023Record due
04/20/2023Docketing statement filed
04/18/2023Fee paid
03/28/2023Fee requested
03/28/2023Docketing statement due
03/28/2023Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals
03/27/2023Notice of appeal filed in trial court
02/27/2023Judgment signed by trial court judge
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
03/24/2024StatusAppellee brief due
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Dodds, AlAppelleeMeghana Wadhwani  
Carlos R. Cortez
Matthew J. Kita
De Diego, Armando AppellantM. Micah Kessler
Trial Court Information
County Court at Law No. 3
Dallas
Honorable Sally Montgomery
CC-19-01423-C
Janet E. Wright