Case Information: 55097 | |||
Short Caption: | BACON (PERCY) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 45615 , 45652 , 45975 , 45976 , 45983 , 46069 , 46576 , 47360 , 48147 , 48169 , 48399 , 50202 , 50403 , 50491 , 50600 , 50612 , 53420 , 53492 , 53767 , 53768 , 53804 , 53886 , 53915 , 53927 , 54102 , 54450 , 54479 , 54680 , 54741 , 54742 , 54874 , 55440 , 55456 , 55540 , 55767 , 55778 , 56106 , 56449 , 56601 , 57017 , 57080 , 57214 , 57541 , 57659 , 57660 , 57661 , 58954 , 60161 , 61076 , 61280 , 61778 , 61779 , 61780 , 61803 , 61898 , 61899 , 61971 , 62026 , 62043 , 62166 , 62240 , 62681 , 63217 , 64428 , 67110 , 67701 , 67802 , 67803 , 67804 , 67824 , 68012 , 68159 , 68639 , 68852 , 78120 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C212233 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | En Banc | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 06/02/2010 | How Submitted: | On Record |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
12/16/2009 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | 09-30568 | |
12/16/2009 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
12/21/2009 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Transmit Required Document. Notice of Entry of Decision and Order filed 10/01/09. Due Date: 10 days | 09-30892 | |
01/05/2010 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Entry of Judgment or Order. Notice of Entry of Decision and Order. Filed in district court on: 10/1/09. | 10-00225 | |
02/03/2010 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." [We have considered the proper person documents submitted in this matter and conclude that no relief is warranted for the reason set forth above.] NNP10-MC/NS/MG. | 10-02981 | |
04/07/2010 | Post-Judgment Order | Filed Order/Rehearing Granted. and Order Re: Entry of Post-Conviction Order. District Court Order due: 30 days. | 10-09013 | |
05/03/2010 | Order/Incoming | Filed District Court Order. Certified copy of order filed in district court on April 15, 2010. Findings of Fact, Conclusions of Law and Order. | 10-11287 | |
05/12/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Re: Record on Appeal. Upon issuance of the remittitur in Docket No. 54680, this court directs the clerk of this court to transfer the record on appeal previously filed in Docket No. 54680 to Docket No. 55097. Nos. 54680/55097. | 10-12386 | |
05/27/2010 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal Copy. Vols 9-12. | 10-13834 | |
06/02/2010 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal Copy. Vols. 1 through 8. (TRANSFERRED FROM CASE 54680 PER ORDER FILED ON 5/12/10) | 10-14166 | |
06/02/2010 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
07/22/2010 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." NNP10-MC/NS/MG fn5[We have reviewed all documents that appellant has submitted in proper person to the clerk of this court in this matter, and we conclude that no relief based upon those submissions is warranted.] | 10-18940 | |
09/30/2010 | Post-Judgment Order | Filed Order/Rehearing Denied. "Rehearing denied." NRAP 40(c). | 10-25289 | |
11/17/2010 | Post-Judgment Order | Filed Order Denying En Banc Reconsideration. Having considered the petition on file herein, we have concluded that en banc reconsideration is not warranted. NRAP 40A. Accordingly, we "ORDER the petition DENIED." | 10-30022 | |
12/13/2010 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 10-32453 | |
12/13/2010 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
12/20/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. On July 22, 2010, this court affirmed the order of the district court. A subsequent petition for rehearing and a petition for en banc reconsideration were denied. On October 25, 2010, this court received a proper person document labeled "judicial notice." To the extent that appellant seeks relief, this court denies the relief sought. | 10-33100 | |
12/28/2010 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on December 21, 2010. | 10-32453 | |
04/21/2011 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice from US Supreme Court/Certiorari Filed. A petition for a writ of certiorari was filed on February 4, 2011 and placed on the docket April 15, 2011 as Case No. 10-10024. | 11-11897 | |
06/10/2011 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice from US Supreme Court/Certiorari Denied. The petition for a writ of certiorari is denied. | 11-17353 |