Case Information: 55090 | |||
Short Caption: | JAA (DAVID) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 54294 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR090004 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Other - Other/Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
12/15/2009 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | 09-30282 | |
12/15/2009 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
02/03/2010 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." NNP10-MC/NS/MG | 10-02961 | |
03/02/2010 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 10-04532 | |
03/02/2010 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
03/09/2010 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on March 3, 2010. | 10-04532 |