Case: 23-0771
23-0771
09/21/2023
Petition for Review under Tex. R. App. P. 53.1
COTTONWOOD TRAIL INVESTMENTS, LLC
PIRATES PROPERTY OWNERS ASSOCIATION
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
11/07/2023 | Reply to Response | Petitioner | Reply in Support of Petition for Review filed on behalf of Cottonwood Trail Investments, LLC. | |||||
10/20/2023 | Response to Petition | Respondent | Response to Petition for Review filed on behalf of Pirates Property Owners Association | |||||
09/20/2023 | Petition for Review | Petitioner | Petition for Review filed on behalf of Cottonwood Trail Investments, LLC. |
|
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
01/26/2024 | Motion to Consolidate disposed | Filing dismissed as moot | Motion to Consolidate dismissed as moot | | ||||
01/26/2024 | Petition for Review disposed | Denied | |
| ||||
11/07/2023 | Reply to Response | Reply in Support of Petition for Review filed on behalf of Cottonwood Trail Investments, LLC. | ||||||
11/06/2023 | MET to file reply disposed of | Filing granted | Motion for Extension of Time to file Reply in Support of Petition for Review is granted. Reply is due November 7, 2023. Further requests for extensions of time for this filing will be disfavored. |
| ||||
11/06/2023 | Motion to Extend Time to File Reply filed | Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Reply in Support of Petition for Review filed on behalf of Cottonwood Trail Investments, LLC. | ||||||
10/31/2023 | Motion to Exceed Word Limit disposed | Filing granted | Motion to Exceed Word Limit is granted. |
| ||||
10/24/2023 | Case forwarded to Court | | | |||||
10/23/2023 | Electronic communication sent to Party | Email sent to counsel for Petitioner to determine opposition to Motion filed. | | |||||
10/20/2023 | Motion to Exceed Word Limit | Motion to Exceed Word Limit filed on behalf of Pirates Property Owners Association. | ||||||
10/20/2023 | Response to Petition | Response to Petition for Review filed on behalf of Pirates Property Owners Association | ||||||
09/26/2023 | Reply to Response to Motion | Reply to Response to Motion to Consolidate filed on behalf of Cottonwood Trail Investments, LLC. | ||||||
09/26/2023 | Response to Motion filed | Response to Motion to Consolidate filed on behalf of Pirates Property Owners Association. | ||||||
09/21/2023 | Electronic communication sent to Party | Email sent to Counsel for Respondent to determine if a response to the motion will be filed. | | |||||
09/21/2023 | Motion to Consolidate filed | Opposed Motion to Consolidate filed on behalf of Cottonwood Trail Investments, LLC. | ||||||
09/21/2023 | Clerk's Record | | | |||||
09/20/2023 | Petition for Review | Petition for Review filed on behalf of Cottonwood Trail Investments, LLC. |
|
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
02/12/2024 | Status | Motion for rehearing due to be filed. |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Cottonwood Trail Investments, LLC | Petitioner | Mr. J. Patrick Sutton |
Pirates Property Owners Association | Respondent | Mr. Nicholas "Adam" Pugh Mr. Christopher J. Archambault Ms. Shawna Dalrymple Mr. Weston Ray |
Court of Appeals Information:
01-22-00400-CV
Affirmed
___ SW3d ___, 08-29-23
1st Court of Appeals
Honorable Sarah Beth Landau
Trial Court Information
10th District Court
Galveston
Honorable Kerry Lane Neves
21-CV-0240