judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

STATE, BUS. & INDUS. VS. ALL STAR BAIL BONDS

Case Information: 36293
Short Caption:STATE, BUS. & INDUS. VS. ALL STAR BAIL BONDSCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A414399Classification:Civil Appeal - Administrative Agency - General
Disqualifications:BeckerCase Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Justice Maupin for Justice BeckerPanel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:06/26/2000 / Shoen, LynnSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
06/15/2000Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
06/15/2000Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 00-10250
06/26/2000Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Lynn R. Shoen. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts and docketing statement suspended pending further order of this court.)
09/29/2000MotionFiled Motion for Stay. 00-17270
10/11/2000MotionFiled Response to Motion. Opposition to Motion for Stay. (Las Vegas Mail Drop Box 10/09/00). 00-17943
10/12/2000Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. Addendum to Opposition to Motion for Stay. (signed certificate of service). 00-18104
10/20/2000Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. 00-18626
10/20/2000Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Docketing Statement. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) Due Date: 15 days
11/01/2000Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this appeal. Upon the filing of the docketing statement, this court shall conduct a preliminary jurisdictional review of this appeal. Appellant: 15 days to comply with NRAP 9(a); 120 days to file and serve opening brief and appendix. Briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). fn2[We defer ruling on appellants' September 29, 2000 motion for a stay, pending further order of this court.] 00-19186
11/03/2000Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 00-19383
11/16/2000Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: April 24, 2000. To Court Reporter: Diane Prock. 00-20174
12/12/2000TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: April 24, 2000. Court Reporter: Diann Prock. 00-21689
02/27/2001MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Brief due: March 30, 2001. 01-03628
03/30/2001BriefFiled Opening Brief. Mailed on: Hand delivered 03/30/01. 01-05590
03/30/2001AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. Vols. 1 through 5. 01-05591
04/26/2001MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Brief due: May 31, 2001. 01-07026
06/01/2001MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 01-09158
06/11/2001Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order Granting Motion. filed June 1, 2001. The clerk shall file the answreing brief received on June 6, 2001. Appellants shall have 30 days from the date of this order to file and serve a reply brief. 01-09628
06/11/2001BriefFiled Answering Brief. Mailed on: LV Drop Box 06/04/01. 01-09411
07/09/2001MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Brief due: August 10, 2001. 01-11497
08/10/2001BriefFiled Reply Brief. Mailed on: Hand delivered 08/10/01. 01-13634
10/03/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Show Cause. Response due from appellants: 30 days from the date of this order. 01-16620
11/02/2001MotionFiled Response to Order to Show Cause. Response of Appellants State of Nevada, Department of Business and Industry, Division of Insurance, and Alice Molasky-Arman, Commissioner of Insurance to Order to Show Cause. 01-18398
05/03/2002OtherDisqualification of Justice Becker. Sat in lower court proceedings.
05/16/2002Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." fn4[In light of this order, we deny as moot appellants' motion for stay.] NNP02-WM/MS/RR 02-08634
06/11/2002RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 02-08703
06/11/2002Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
07/22/2002RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on July 15, 2002. 02-08703