judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

CORRINE L. SHEAFFER v. STATE OF WYOMING ex rel., UNIVERSITY OF WYOMING, through its BOARD OF TRUSTEES; RICHARD C. JOHNSON, Individually; KEVIN A. WHITE, Individually; and BRUCE HOOPER, Individually

Case Heading (S-07-0269)
Case Number:S-07-0269Case Docketed On:11/26/2007
Status:Closed
Original Court:Second Judicial District Albany CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Labor and Employment (Title 27)
Short Title:CORRINE L. SHEAFFER v. STATE OF WYOMING ex rel., UNIVERSITY OF WYOMING, through its BOARD OF TRUSTEES; RICHARD C. JOHNSON, Individually; KEVIN A. WHITE, Individually; and BRUCE HOOPER, Individually
Full Title:CORRINE L. SHEAFFER, Appellant (Plaintiff), v. STATE OF WYOMING ex rel., UNIVERSITY OF WYOMING, through its BOARD OF TRUSTEES; RICHARD C. JOHNSON, Individually; KEVIN A. WHITE, Individually; and BRUCE HOOPER, Individually, Appellees, (Defendants).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantCorrine L. SheafferWilliam G. Hibbler
AppelleeUniversity of WyomingStephen H. Kline
AppelleeRichard C. JohnsonStephen H. Kline
AppelleeKevin A. WhiteStephen H. Kline
AppelleeBruce HooperStephen H. Kline

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Civil Rights - Discrimination, Employment Law
Opinion Number:2009 WY 19
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
11/26/2007Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
11/26/2007Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
11/26/2007Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
11/26/2007Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
01/09/2008Brief - Appellant; received copy of designation of record on appealBriefAppellantFinal
02/25/2008Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
02/25/2008Brief - Appellees; received copy of brief on disk; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.BriefAppelleeFinal
02/27/2008Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - William Hibbler for appellant.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
03/10/2008Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Stephen Kline for appellees.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
03/11/2008Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
03/11/2008Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
03/14/2008Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
03/14/2008Record - Transmitted record on appeal, four volumes. Volumes I-II, original papers; Volume III, transcripts; Volume IV, affidavits and exhibits.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
03/14/2008Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
03/17/2008Notice-Incoming - Errata to reply brief of appellantNotice-IncomingErrataFinal
04/01/2008Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before Chief Justice Voigt, Justices Golden, Hill and Burke (William G. Hibbler for appellant; Stephen H. Kline for appellees) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
04/01/2008Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
02/18/2009Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming. Justice Hill writing for the court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
03/06/2009Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
03/06/2009Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
03/06/2009Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
03/06/2009Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
03/10/2009Service - Certified mail signature return card. Record signed for 3/09/09.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal