judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

IN RE: MARGARET R. MILLER; JESSE H. MERRELL, APLT

Case Information: 10-PR-1143
Short Caption:IN RE: MARGARET R. MILLER; JESSE H. MERRELL, APLTClassification:Appeals - Probate - Probate
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:INT311-09Filed Date:09/01/2010

Opening Event Date:09/01/2010Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:09/23/2010Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:12/08/2010
Argued/Submitted:04/21/2011
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:06/08/2011

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJesse H. Merrell N
Herbert Alan Dubin YN
AppelleeLeroy M. FykesNPro SeN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
09/01/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
09/17/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal filed in this case on September 1, 2010, and it appearing that no transcript is needed for this appeal, it is ORDERED that a briefing order will be issued upon the filing in this court, by the Clerk of the Superior Court, of the record index in accordance with D.C. App. R. 11 (b)(3)(A). (JAC) elp
09/23/2010RECORD INDEX
09/23/2010RECORD COMPLETED
09/27/2010 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (a)(1), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellees' briefs shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (JAC) elp
11/08/2010APPELLANT'S BRIEF (appendix attached)
11/08/2010APPENDIX (see brief)
12/08/2010APPELLEE'S BRIEF
12/08/2010BRIEFS COMPLETED
01/03/2011APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF
01/18/2011FINAL SCREENING - SUMMARY CALENDAR I
03/02/2011CALENDAR NOTICE SENT
03/17/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION REQUESTING ORAL ARGUMENT
04/06/2011ORDER GRANT APLT MOTION REQUESTING ORAL ARGUMENT and the parties are to be present in the District of Columbia Court of Appeals courtroom, located at 430 E Street, N.W., on the second floor, at 2:25 p.m. on April 21, 2011. (JAC)
04/21/2011FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
04/21/2011FiledARGUED before Judges Ruiz, Ferren, Steadman Herbert Alan Dubin, Esq. for the APPELLANT Charlene A. Johnson, Esq. for the APPELLEE (Leroy M. Fykes, Pro Se.)
05/17/2011AFFIRMED (MOJ) (Ruiz, Associate Judge, and Ferren and Steadman, Senior Judges.)
06/08/2011MANDATE ISSUED