Case Information: 51304 | |||
Short Caption: | WARDEN VS. ACKERMAN (HOWARD) | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 45896 , 52966 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C197569 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Life - Post-Conviction |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 10/22/2008 | How Submitted: | On Briefs |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
03/24/2008 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
03/24/2008 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) | 08-07156 | |
04/11/2008 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | 08-09081 | |
04/17/2008 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to File Transcript Request. Due Date: 10 days | 08-09674 | |
04/30/2008 | Transcript Request | Filed Certificate of No Transcript Request. | 08-10763 | |
07/10/2008 | Motion | Filed Motion to Dismiss Appeal. | 08-17663 | |
07/21/2008 | Motion | Filed Response to Motion. Appellant's Opposition to Respondent's Motion to Dismiss Appeal. | 08-18718 | |
07/24/2008 | Brief | Filed Opening Brief. | 08-19147 | |
07/24/2008 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. | 08-19152 | |
08/19/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Denying Motion. to dismiss this appeal for failure to file the opening brief. | 08-21393 | |
09/03/2008 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to File Answering Brief. | 08-22655 | |
09/22/2008 | Brief | Filed Answering Brief. | 08-24450 | |
10/22/2008 | Brief | Filed Reply Brief. | 08-27173 | |
10/22/2008 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
03/27/2009 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. of Limited Remand for Clarification and Order Directing Attorney General to Provide Transcript of Hearing. This court remands this matter to the district court for the limited purpose of clarifying its order and informing this court whether the district court determined that Ackerman's due process rights were violated within 30 days from the date of this order. This court directs the Attorney General within 30 days from the date of this order to supplement the appendix and provide this court with a copy of the December 4, 2007 transcript. | 09-07790 | |
04/08/2009 | Order/Incoming | Filed District Court Order. Copy of order filed in district court on 4/6/09. Order Nunc Pro Tunc. | 09-08974 | |
04/29/2009 | Motion | Filed Response to Order to Show Cause. Attorney General's Response to Supreme Court Order. | 09-10617 | |
05/05/2009 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Dispositional Order/Appeal. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED IN PART AND REVERSED IN PART." NNP09-MC/NS/MG | 09-11160 | |
06/02/2009 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 09-12773 | |
06/02/2009 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
06/10/2009 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on June 4, 2009. | 09-12773 |