Case Information: 51293 | |||
Short Caption: | ROBERSON (LAVELL) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 55115 , 55186 , 58572 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C238973 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
03/21/2008 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
03/21/2008 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person Fast Track. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast track notice mailed to trial counsel.) | 08-07011 | |
04/03/2008 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Transmit Required Document. Judgment of Conviction and Amended Judgment of Conviction filed on April 2, 2008. Due Date: 10 days. | 08-08429 | |
04/15/2008 | Order/Incoming | Filed District Court Order. Certified copy of order filed in district court on 04/02/08. | 08-09282 | |
05/07/2008 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. Appellant's Motion for Extension of Time. (First Request). | 08-11378 | |
06/03/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Granting Motion. Fast Track Statement and Appendix due: 40 days. | 08-13922 | |
06/06/2008 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Mary Beth Cook stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: dates not given. | 08-14356 | |
07/17/2008 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. Appellant's Motion for Extension of Time. (30 days). | 08-18412 | |
07/28/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Extending Time. Appellant shall have 30 days from the date of this order to file and serve the fast track statement and appendix. Counsel for appellant is cautioned that no further extensions of time will be granted absent a demonstration of extreme and unforeseeable circumstances. | 08-19348 | |
08/27/2008 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Statement. | 08-22098 | |
08/27/2008 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Statement. Vols. 1 through 2. | 08-22099 | |
09/18/2008 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Response. | 08-24232 | |
09/22/2008 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Transmit Required Document. Amended Judgment of Conviction entered 4/18/08, Second Amended Judgment of Conviction entered 5/21/08. Due Date: 10 days | 08-24458 | |
10/15/2008 | Order/Incoming | Filed District Court Order. Certified copy of order filed in district court on April 18, 2008. Amended Judgment of Conviction (Jury Trial). | 08-26671 | |
10/15/2008 | Order/Incoming | Filed District Court Order. Certified copy of order filed in district court on May 21, 2008. Second Amended Judgment of Conviction. | 08-26673 | |
10/15/2008 | Order/Incoming | Filed District Court Order. Certified copy of order filed in district court on May 21, 2008. Second Amended Judgment of Conviction (Jury Trial). | 08-26674 | |
04/08/2009 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED." NNP09-MC/NS/MG | 09-08853 | |
05/05/2009 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 09-09628 | |
05/05/2009 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
05/13/2009 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on May 8, 2009. | 09-09628 |