Case: 01-23-00955-CV
01-23-00955-CV
12/22/2023
Contract
Santosh Mukerji and Trimcos, LLC
Aquatic Solutions of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
03/08/2024 | Court reporters notice to court regarding status of record | | |||||
03/08/2024 | Extension of time to file reporters record disposed | Extension of time to file GRANTED, with no further extensions |
| ||||
03/08/2024 | Extension of time to file reporters record filed |
| |||||
03/07/2024 | No payment arrangements made with trial court clerk for record |
| |||||
03/07/2024 | Clerks notice to court regarding status of record |
| |||||
03/07/2024 | No payment arrangements made with court reporter for record |
| |||||
03/07/2024 | Court reporters notice to court regarding status of record |
| |||||
03/07/2024 | Reporters record due | | |||||
02/12/2024 | Response due | | |||||
02/07/2024 | Response due | | |||||
02/06/2024 | Extension of time to file reporters record disposed | Motion or Writ Granted |
| ||||
02/05/2024 | Extension of time to file reporters record filed |
| |||||
02/05/2024 | Reporters record due | | |||||
01/26/2024 | Fee paid |
| |||||
01/11/2024 | Past due court fee notice |
| |||||
01/11/2024 | Court fee due | | |||||
01/11/2024 | Docketing statement due | | |||||
01/08/2024 | No clerks record filed in civil case |
| |||||
01/05/2024 | Extension of time to file reporters record disposed | Motion or Writ Granted |
| ||||
01/05/2024 | Extension of time to file reporters record filed |
| |||||
01/05/2024 | Record due | | |||||
12/22/2023 | Case began in court of appeals |
| |||||
12/22/2023 | Notice of appeal received |
| |||||
12/04/2023 | Notice of appeal filed in trial court | | |||||
10/09/2023 | Motion for new trial was filed in the trial court | | |||||
09/07/2023 | Judgment signed by trial court judge | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
03/21/2024 | Status | Court reporters record due |
04/08/2024 | Status | Response due to court order or case will be dismissed |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Aquatic Solutions of Texas | Appellee | Ramez Shamieh |
Santosh Mukerji and Trimcos, LLC | Appellant | John C. Juravich |
Trial Court Information
165th District Court
Harris
Honorable Judge 165th District Court
2016-19920
Court Reporter 165th District Court