Case Information: 51284 | |||
Short Caption: | EDWARDS VS. SIGNTRONIX | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Lyon Co. - Third Judicial District - CI18903 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - Family Law - Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 05/27/2008 | How Submitted: | On Record |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
03/19/2008 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Christopher Edwards--Nevada State Bank M.O. no. 840111578. | ||
03/19/2008 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person Pilot Program. (Pilot program civil appeals order and documents mailed to proper person appellant.) | 08-06843 | |
03/25/2008 | Brief | Filed Civil Proper Person Appeal Statement. | 08-07306 | |
04/08/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Transmit Record. Record due: 30 days. | 08-08758 | |
05/27/2008 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal Copy. | 08-13203 | |
05/27/2008 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
07/22/2008 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." SNP08-JH/RP/MD | 08-18874 | |
08/19/2008 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 08-19845 | |
08/19/2008 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
08/26/2008 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on August 20, 2008. | 08-19845 |