Case Information: 51283 | |||
Short Caption: | CLARK CO. SCHOOL DIST. VS. STATE, DEP'T OF HEALTH & HUMAN SVCS. | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Carson City - First Judicial District - 0700418A | Classification: | Civil Appeal - Administrative Agency - General |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Disposition Filed/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | 04/02/2008 / Gang, Leonard | SP Status: | Completed |
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
03/19/2008 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
03/19/2008 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice Re Settlement Conference Program and Suspension of Rules mailed to all counsel. (The requesting of transcripts and briefing are stayed pursuant to NRAP 16(a)(1). Docketing Statement Form mailed to counsel for appellant(s).) | 08-06833 | |
03/20/2008 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Case Appeal Statement. | 08-06925 | |
03/26/2008 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Confirm as Counsel. To Carson City School District. Due Date: 10 days | 08-07377 | |
04/02/2008 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Leonard I. Gang. | 08-08210 | |
04/03/2008 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | 08-08393 | |
04/03/2008 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice. Notice to Confirm. Valerie Cain as Representative to and for the Carson City School District. | 08-08419 | |
04/16/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. . Ms. Valerie Cain cannot act as the legal representative for Carson District in this appeal. Carson District shall have 30 days from the date of this order to retain counsel and cause new counsel to file a notice of appearance with this court. Failure to comply with this order may result in Carson District's appeal being dismissed. The deadlines for the settlement judge to file an early case assessment report and a final settlement status report are stayed pending appearance of counsel and further order of this court. | 08-09466 | |
04/17/2008 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 10/01/07. To Court Reporter: Sunshine Reporting Services. | 08-09558 | |
04/24/2008 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Appearance. Representing appellant Carson City School District: Attorney Mike Pavlakis of Allison MacKenzie Pavlakis Wright & Fagan Ltd. | 08-10191 | |
06/03/2008 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for 7/16/08. | 08-13976 | |
07/11/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. . The settlement judge shall have 180 days from the date of this order to file a Final Settlement Conference Status Report. | 08-17834 | |
07/21/2008 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. | 08-18725 | |
07/21/2008 | Motion | Filed Stipulation/Dismiss Appeal. | 08-18727 | |
07/25/2008 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the settlement conference, the stipulation of the parties and cause appearing, " . . . this appeal is dismissed." The parties shall bear their own costs and attorney fees. NRAP 42(b). CLK-TH | 08-19297 | |
07/25/2008 | Case Status Update | Case Closed. No remittitur issued. |