Case Information: 55124 | |||
Short Caption: | STATE VS. HOLMES | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Nye Co. - Fifth Judicial District - HC0006065 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Pretrial |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 02/01/2010 | How Submitted: | On Record |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
12/22/2009 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
12/22/2009 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) | 09-31045 | |
12/22/2009 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to File Rough Draft Transcript Request. Due date: 10 days. | 09-31046 | |
01/08/2010 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Teresa Dougherty stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 11/17/09. | 10-00695 | |
01/14/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Transmit Record. Record due: 20 days. The parties shall disregard the briefing notice that was issued by this court on December 22, 2009. Unless this court otherwise orders, upon receipt of the record, this appeal shall stand submitted for decision without briefing or oral argument. | 10-01192 | |
01/15/2010 | Motion | Filed Motion. Emergency Motion to Stay Trial Pursuant to N.R.A.P. 27(a) | 10-01379 | |
01/22/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Granting Stay. Appellant has filed a motion for a stay of the district court proceedings while this appeal from the district court order granting in part and denying in part a pretrial petition for a writ of habeas corpus is pending. Cause appearing, we grant the unopposed motion. The district court proceedings shall be stayed pending the resolution of this appeal. | 10-01891 | |
02/01/2010 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal Copy. Vols. 1 and 2. | 10-02769 | |
02/01/2010 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
03/11/2010 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Reversal and Remand. "ORDER the judgment of the district court REVERSED AND REMAND this matter to the district court for proceedings consistent with this order." SNP10-JH/MD/KP | 10-06405 | |
04/07/2010 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 10-07080 | |
04/07/2010 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
04/22/2010 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on April 13, 2010. | 10-07080 |