Case Information: 51331 | |||
Short Caption: | ROBINSON (TYSON) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 56532 , 57456 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C223076 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 06/17/2008 | How Submitted: | On Record |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
03/27/2008 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
03/27/2008 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | 08-07582 | |
03/31/2008 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Transmit Required Document. Findings of Fact, Conclusions of Law and Order filed 3/26/08. Due Date: 10 days | 08-07843 | |
04/07/2008 | Order/Incoming | Filed District Court Order. Certified copy of order filed in district court on 03/26/08. Findings of Fact, Conclusions of Law and Order. | 08-08665 | |
04/21/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Transmit Record. Record due: 90 days. | 08-09782 | |
06/17/2008 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal Copy. | 08-15455 | |
06/17/2008 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
12/02/2008 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." SNP08-JH/RP/MD. | 08-30611 | |
12/30/2008 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 08-31161 | |
12/30/2008 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
01/12/2009 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on January 6, 2009. | 08-31161 |