Case Information: 55160 | |||
Short Caption: | JOHNSON VS. DIST. CT. (CITY OF LAS VEGAS) | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C257485 | Classification: | Original Proceeding - Criminal - Certiorari/Prohibition |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
12/30/2009 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
12/30/2009 | Petition/Writ | Filed Petition for Writ of Mandamus or Prohibition. To require the Honorable Donald M. Mosley to Vacate his Order Entered December 22, 2009 and Dismiss the City's Appeal for Lack of Jurisdiction. | 09-31506 | |
12/30/2009 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Petition for Writ. | 09-31507 | |
01/08/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Answer Writ Petition. Answer due: 20 days. | 10-00680 | |
02/01/2010 | Petition/Writ | Filed Answer to Petition for Writ. Answer and Opposition. | 10-02787 | |
02/01/2010 | Appendix | Filed Appendix. Real Party in Interest's Appendix to Answer and Opposition/with CD Rom. | 10-02788 | |
03/11/2010 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Granting Petition. ORDER the petition GRANTED AND DIRECT THE CLERK OF THIS COURT TO ISSUE A WRIT OF MANDAMUS instructing the district court to vacate its order granting the real party in interest's appeal and enter an order dismissing the appeal for lack of jurisdiction. SNP10-JH/MD/KP | 10-06418 | |
03/11/2010 | Writ | Issued Writ. Original and one copy of writ and copy of order mailed to, John Glenn Watkins for service upon Judge Donald M. Mosley. | 10-06445 | |
03/17/2010 | Writ | Filed Writ. Served on Judge Donald M. Mosley on March 16, 2010. | 10-06445 | |
04/07/2010 | Remittitur | Issued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur. | 10-07071 | |
04/07/2010 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. |