Case Information: 51343 | |||
Short Caption: | JARA (LUIS) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 48030 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR060272 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 07/10/2008 | How Submitted: | On Record |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
03/28/2008 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
03/28/2008 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | 08-07780 | |
04/21/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Transmit Record. Record due: 90 days. | 08-09784 | |
07/10/2008 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal Copy. | 08-17667 | |
07/10/2008 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
07/10/2008 | Other | Other. Filed Pre-Sentence Investigation Report. (SEALED). | 08-17668 | |
11/21/2008 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." SNP08-JH/RP/MD | 08-29881 | |
12/16/2008 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 08-30329 | |
12/16/2008 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
12/26/2008 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on December 17, 2008. | 08-30329 |