Case: 05-24-00177-CV
05-24-00177-CV
02/19/2024
Injunction
Robert Wolf and AYA Healthcare, Inc.
AMN Healthcare, Inc. and AMN Healthcare Locum Tenens, Inc. f/k/a Staff Care, Inc.
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
03/07/2024 | Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed |
| |||||
03/06/2024 | Response filed |
| |||||
03/05/2024 | Response filed |
| |||||
03/04/2024 | No reporters record filed in civil case |
| |||||
02/29/2024 | Electronic Clerks Record Filed |
| |||||
02/29/2024 | Record due | | |||||
02/26/2024 | Notice received | | |||||
02/22/2024 | Docketing statement filed | ||||||
02/20/2024 | Fee paid |
| |||||
02/20/2024 | Docketing statement due |
| |||||
02/20/2024 | Letter issued by the court |
| |||||
02/20/2024 | Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals |
| |||||
02/19/2024 | Notice of appeal filed in trial court | | |||||
02/19/2024 | Case began in court of appeals | | |||||
02/02/2024 | Judgment signed by trial court judge | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
03/27/2024 | Status | Appellant brief due |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
AMN Healthcare, Inc. and AMN Healthcare Locum Tenens, Inc. f/k/a Staff Care, Inc. | Appellee | John T. Cox III Christine L. Demana Betty X. Yang |
Robert Wolf and AYA Healthcare, Inc. | Appellant | Robert B. Gilbreath |
Trial Court Information
95th District Court
Dallas
Honorable Monica Purdy
DC-23-18965
Deana K. Rouse