Case: 08-22-00106-CV
08-22-00106-CV
06/20/2022
Miscellaneous/other civil
Jo Ann Zuniga
Amistad Motors
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
12/13/2022 | Brief filed - oral argument not requested | Appellee |
| ||||
11/14/2022 | Brief filed - oral argument not requested | Appellant |
|
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
08/18/2023 | Mandate issued |
| |||||||
05/26/2023 | Sent to publisher | | |||||||
05/26/2023 | Opinion issued | Affirmed |
| ||||||
04/14/2023 | Submitted | | |||||||
03/15/2023 | Set for submission on briefs |
| |||||||
12/13/2022 | Case ready to be set | | |||||||
12/13/2022 | Brief filed - oral argument not requested |
| |||||||
11/14/2022 | Brief filed - oral argument not requested |
| |||||||
10/18/2022 | Supplemental reporters record filed |
| |||||||
10/06/2022 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted |
| ||||||
10/06/2022 | Fee paid | | |||||||
10/06/2022 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed |
| |||||||
09/20/2022 | Letter received | | |||||||
09/19/2022 | Appearance of counsel |
| |||||||
09/12/2022 | Reporters record filed |
| |||||||
08/17/2022 | Extension of time to file reporters record disposed | Motion or Writ Granted |
| ||||||
08/17/2022 | Extension of time to file reporters record filed |
| |||||||
07/27/2022 | Clerks record filed |
| |||||||
07/19/2022 | Extension of time to file reporters record disposed | Motion or Writ Granted |
| ||||||
07/18/2022 | Extension of time to file reporters record filed |
| |||||||
07/15/2022 | Email sent | | |||||||
07/14/2022 | Extension of time to file clerks record disposed | Motion or Writ Granted |
| ||||||
07/14/2022 | Extension of time to file clerks record filed |
| |||||||
07/13/2022 | Response filed |
| |||||||
07/12/2022 | Extension of time to file clerks record filed |
| |||||||
06/24/2022 | Notice of appeal received | | |||||||
06/24/2022 | Motion for extension of time to file notice of appeal disposed | Motion or Writ Granted |
| ||||||
06/23/2022 | Fee paid | | |||||||
06/23/2022 | Motion for extension of time to file notice of appeal filed |
| |||||||
06/21/2022 | Docketing statement filed |
| |||||||
06/21/2022 | Order entered |
| |||||||
06/20/2022 | Fee paid | | |||||||
06/20/2022 | Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals |
|
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
08/18/2023 | Retention | Date civil case will be destroyed (6 yrs after mandate) |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Zuniga, JoAnn | Appellant | Hon. Larry Moreno |
Amistad Motors | Appellee | Hon. Angela M. Nickey |
Trial Court Information
83rd District Court
Pecos
Honorable Robert E. Cadena
P-8110-83-CV
Whitney Harry