Case Information: 51332 | |||
Short Caption: | MITCHELL (DEANGELO) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 37531 , 37553 , 40150 , 42638 , 44093 , 46213 , 46887 , 53085 , 62069 , 62372 , 66079 , 66080 , 66428 , 66428-COA , 66773 , 66773-COA , 69542 , 70017 , 70017-COA , 76899 , 82127 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C156542 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Life - Post-Conviction/Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
03/27/2008 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
03/27/2008 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | 08-07583 | |
04/09/2008 | Motion | Received Proper Person Motion. Voluntary Dismissal of Pending Appeal. | 08-08842 | |
05/05/2008 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Dismissing Appeal. We direct the clerk of this court tio file appellant's April 9, 2008 motion. "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." NNP08-WM/MC/NS. | 08-11059 | |
05/05/2008 | Motion | Filed Proper Person Motion. Voluntary Dismissal of Pending Appeal. | 08-08842 | |
05/30/2008 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 08-11787 | |
05/30/2008 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
06/11/2008 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on June 3, 2008. | 08-11787 |