Case Information: 51333 | |||
Short Caption: | HERNANDEZ (MARCO) VS. DISTRICT COURT C/W 50445 | Court: | Supreme Court |
Consolidated: | 50445 *, 51333 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Elko Co. - Fourth Judicial District - CRFP072020 | Classification: | Original Proceeding - Criminal - Mandamus |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | En Banc | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | 11/03/2008 at 11:30 AM | Oral Argument Location: | Carson City |
Submission Date: | 11/03/2008 | How Submitted: | After Oral Argument |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
03/27/2008 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
03/27/2008 | Petition/Writ | Filed Petition for Writ of Mandamus. | 08-07608 | |
03/27/2008 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Petition for Writ. | 08-07609 | |
03/31/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Directing Answer. Real Party in Interest's Answer due 20 days. | 08-07829 | |
04/03/2008 | Motion | Filed Motion. Motion by the State for an Order of the Court Permitting the State to Provisionally File an Answer to, and an Appendix to the State's Answer to Petition for Writ of Mandate. | 08-08441 | |
04/03/2008 | Petition/Writ | Filed Answer to Petition for Writ. The State's Answer to the Petitioner's Petition for Writ of Mandate. | 08-08443 | |
04/03/2008 | Appendix | Filed Appendix. Appendix to the State's Answer. | 08-08444 | |
04/07/2008 | Motion | Filed Motion. Motion to File the State's Answer to, and Appendix to the State's Answer to Petition for Writ of Mandate Previously Transmitted to the Court. | 08-08608 | |
04/17/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Denying Motion as Moot. The motion filed on April 3, 2008, is denied as moot. fn1[Real party in interest's answer and appendix were filed on April 3, 2008. Real party in interest's April 7, 2008, motion to file its answer and appendix is also denied as moot.] | 08-09600 | |
09/16/2008 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral Argument is scheduled for 30 minutes in Carson City on November 3, 2008 at 11:30 a.m. (En Banc) | 08-23913 | |
11/03/2008 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. Before the En Banc Court. | ||
11/04/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Consolidation. Following oral argument in each of these matters, this court has determined that these writ petitions should be consolidated. Accordingly, they are hereby consolidated. Nos. 50445/51333 (08-28127). | ||
01/29/2009 | Opinion/Dispositional | Filed Authored Opinion. "Petitions Granted." Before the Court EN BANC. fn1-[The Honorable Kristina Pickering, Justice, did not participate in the decision of these matters.] fn7-[We vacate the stay imposed by this court's November 9, 2007, order in Docket No. 50445.] Author: Cherry, Michael A.. Majority: Cherry/Hardesty/Parraguirre/Douglas/Saitta/Gibbons. 125 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 2. EN BANC. Nos. 50445/51333. | 09-02489 | |
01/29/2009 | Writ | Issued Writ. Original and one copy of writ and copy of opinion mailed to Alina M. Kilpatrick, Deputy Public Defender for service upon Judge Andrew J. Puccinelli. | 09-02621 | |
02/03/2009 | Writ | Filed Writ. Served on Judge Leon Aberasturi on February 2, 2009. Nos. 50445/51333 (09-02619). | ||
02/11/2009 | Writ | Filed Writ. Served on Judge Andrew J. Puccinelli on February 6, 2009. Nos. 50445/51333. (09-02621) | 09-02621 | |
02/24/2009 | Remittitur | Issued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur. | 09-03641 | |
02/24/2009 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. |