Case Information: 51341 | |||
Short Caption: | LAING VS. LAING | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 51251 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Douglas Co. - Ninth Judicial District - 05DI0503 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - General - Other |
Disqualifications: | Gibbons | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed |
Replacement: | Justice Saitta for Justice Gibbons | Panel Assigned: | Panel |
To SP/Judge: | 04/02/2008 / Worrell, Carolyn | SP Status: | Completed |
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 11/23/2009 | How Submitted: | |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
03/28/2008 | Other | Disqualification of Justice Gibbons. | ||
03/28/2008 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Law Office of Richard F. Cornell--check no. 12432. | ||
03/28/2008 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice Re Settlement Conference Program and Suspension of Rules mailed to all counsel. (The requesting of transcripts and briefing are stayed pursuant to NRAP 16(a)(1). Docketing Statement Form mailed to counsel for appellant(s).) | 08-07781 | |
04/02/2008 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Carolyn Worrell. | 08-08195 | |
04/04/2008 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | 08-08509 | |
07/10/2008 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. 51251 and 51341. This matter is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference will be held on 7/28/08. | 08-17532 | |
08/05/2008 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. Counsel will file a motion requesting that briefing be stayed because of a potential jurisdictional defect. | 08-20195 | |
08/13/2008 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Association of Counsel. Representing respondent. | 08-20881 | |
10/15/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Appellant: 10 days to inform this court in writing, whether appellant has filed a bankruptcy petition, and if so, the status of those proceedings. | 08-26567 | |
10/27/2008 | Motion | Filed Response to Order to Show Cause. Response to Order filed October 15, 2008. | 08-27544 | |
12/05/2008 | Settlement Order/Procedural | Filed Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellant: 15 days to request transcripts; 90 days to file and serve opening brief and appendix. | 08-31041 | |
12/10/2008 | Transcript Request | Filed Certificate of No Transcript Request. Notice Re. Transcripts. | 08-31470 | |
02/26/2009 | Brief | Filed Opening Brief. | 09-05052 | |
02/26/2009 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. Vols. 1 and 2. | 09-05053 | |
03/13/2009 | Letter/Incoming | Filed Letter. Courtesy copy from Robert Eisenberg addressed to Richard Cornell regarding Certificate of Service for Opening Brief. | 09-06456 | |
03/30/2009 | Brief | Filed Answering Brief. | 09-07863 | |
03/30/2009 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Answering Brief. | 09-07869 | |
05/12/2009 | Case Status Update | Briefing Completed. | ||
11/23/2009 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Submit on Briefs. Cause appearing, oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted for decision to the Northern Nevada Panel as of the date of this order on the briefs filed herein. | 09-28460 | |
11/23/2009 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
11/25/2009 | Motion | Filed Motion. Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel. Appellant counsel Robert L. Eisenberg. | 09-28759 | |
12/30/2009 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Granting Motion to Withdraw. The clerk of this court shall remove Mr. Eisenberg and the law firm of Lemons, Grundy & Eisenberg from this appeal's docket. | 09-31566 | |
02/25/2010 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. AFFIRM the order of the district court appointing a receiver." NNP10-MC/JH/NS | 10-05073 | |
03/31/2010 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 10-05817 | |
03/31/2010 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
04/08/2010 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on April 1, 2010. | 10-05817 |