Case Information: 55148 | |||
Short Caption: | CRAWFORD & CO. VS. STRONG-PUZEY | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CV0901317 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - Administrative Agency - General |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Disposition Filed/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
12/29/2009 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice Re Settlement Conference Program and Suspension of Rules mailed to all counsel. (The requesting of transcripts and briefing are stayed pursuant to NRAP 16(a)(1). Docketing Statement Form mailed to counsel for appellant(s).) | 09-31433 | |
12/29/2009 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee due. Filing fee will be fowarded by the District Court. | ||
12/30/2009 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Santoro Drigss Walch Kearney Holley & Thompson Ltd. - check no. 11423. | ||
01/05/2010 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to File Documents. It has been determined that this appeal willl not be scheduled for settlement conference. Transcript request form due: 15 days. Opening Brief due: 120 days. | 10-00245 | |
01/07/2010 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | 10-00380 | |
02/05/2010 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Request Transcripts. | 10-03366 | |
02/10/2010 | Transcript Request | Filed Certificate of No Transcript Request. | 10-03739 | |
04/12/2010 | Motion | Filed Stipulation. Stipulation for Dismissal of Action with prejudice | 10-09426 | |
04/19/2010 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Stipulated Dismissal. Having reviewed the stipulation of the parties filed on April 12, 2010, the stipulation is approved and this appeal is hereby dismissed. The parties shall bear their own costs and attorney fees. NNP. | 10-10226 | |
04/19/2010 | Case Status Update | Case Closed. No remittitur issued. |