Case Information: 51339 | |||
Short Caption: | WOLFF VS. RYMSZA | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A506908 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - General - Other |
Disqualifications: | Saitta | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | 04/08/2008 / Buchanan, William | SP Status: | Completed |
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
03/28/2008 | Other | Disqualification of Justice Saitta. Sat in district court proceedings. | ||
03/28/2008 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from David L. Riddle & Associates--check no. 13181. | ||
03/28/2008 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice Re Settlement Conference Program and Suspension of Rules mailed to all counsel. (The requesting of transcripts and briefing are stayed pursuant to NRAP 16(a)(1). Docketing Statement Form mailed to counsel for appellant(s).) | 08-07730 | |
04/08/2008 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: William F. Buchanan. | 08-08708 | |
04/14/2008 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for 5/22/08. | 08-09203 | |
04/14/2008 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | 08-09223 | |
05/29/2008 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. | 08-13555 | |
06/12/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Show Cause. Appellant shall have 30 days from the date of this order within which to show cause why this appeal should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. Settlement proceedings are concluded and this appeal may proceed. Briefing remains suspended pending further order of this court upon resolution of potential jurisdictional defects. [Copies have been distributed per the ccs listed on the order.] | 08-14908 | |
07/16/2008 | Motion | Filed Response to Order to Show Cause. | 08-18255 | |
07/21/2008 | Motion | Filed Response to Motion. Rymsza's Response to Order to Show Cause. (Respondent's response to appellants response to osc.) | 08-18730 | |
09/05/2008 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." fn10[In light of this order, we deny respondent's motion as moot.] SNP08-JH/RP/MD | 08-22812 | |
09/30/2008 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 08-23471 | |
09/30/2008 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
10/08/2008 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on October 3, 2008. | 08-23471 |