Case Information: 55119 | |||
Short Caption: | BRUBAKER VS. STOCK C/W 54781 | Court: | Supreme Court |
Consolidated: | 54781 *, 55119 | Related Case(s): | 54781 |
Lower Court Case(s): | Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CV0501395 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - General - Other |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | 12/24/2009 / Eisenberg, Robert | SP Status: | Completed |
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
12/22/2009 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice Re Settlement Conference Program and Suspension of Rules mailed to all counsel. (The requesting of transcripts and briefing are stayed pursuant to NRAP 16(a)(1). Docketing Statement Form mailed to counsel for appellant(s).) | 09-31017 | |
12/22/2009 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee due. Filing fee will be fowarded by the District Court. | ||
12/23/2009 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Michael Lehners check no. 21148. | ||
12/24/2009 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Robert L. Eisenberg | 09-31227 | |
12/30/2009 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | 09-31558 | |
01/25/2010 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice. Notice of Bankruptcy Petition Filing. | 10-01963 | |
01/25/2010 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Final Report/No Settlement. 54781 and 55119. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. | 10-01966 | |
03/12/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Concluding Settlement Proceedings and Re: Bankruptcy. Attorney Mark Wray's Status Report due: 20 days. This appeal may proceed. Briefing remains suspended. Nos. 54781/55119 (10-06654). | ||
03/29/2010 | Motion | Filed Response to Order to Show Cause. Statement in Response to Order Concluding Settlement Proceedings and Re: Bankruptcy. Nos. 54781/55119. | 10-08135 | |
05/10/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Dismissing Appeals as to Larry A. Stock Only, Consolidating Appeals and Setting Briefing Schedule. These appeals, as to Stock are dismissed without prejudice to Stock's right to reinstate this appeal upon the lifing of the bankruptcy stay. We further conclude that these appeals should be consolidated. We reinstate the deadlines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs. Appellant and cross-respondent: 15 days each to request transcripts. Appellant: 120 days to file opening brief. Nos. 54781/55119 [10-12044] | ||
06/15/2010 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Request Transcripts. Appellant Stock Trust. Nos. 54781/55119. | ||
06/15/2010 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Request Transcripts. Respondent/Appellant Jerry Brubaker. Nos. 54781/55119. | ||
06/22/2010 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 8/19/10. To Court Reporter: Molezzo Court Reporters. (Appellant Stock). Nos. 54781/55119. | ||
06/28/2010 | Transcript Request | Filed Certificate of No Transcript Request. Nos. 54781/55119. (Respondent/Cross-Appellant Brubaker). | ||
08/27/2010 | Motion | Filed Appellants' Motion to Extend Time for Filing Opening Brief on Appeal. (60 days). Nos. 54781/55119. | 10-22182 | |
08/31/2010 | Motion | Filed Response to Motion. Appellee's Response to Appellant's Motion to Continue Briefing Schedule. Nos. 54781/55119. | 10-22374 | |
09/07/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Opening Brief due: 60 days. Nos. 54781/55119. | 10-22772 | |
11/01/2010 | Motion | Filed Motion to Dismiss Appeal. Appellee's Motion to Dismiss Appeals. Nos. 54781/55119. | 10-28544 | |
01/18/2011 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Dismissing Appeals. Having reviewed the unopposed motion to dismiss, we grant the motion and "ORDER the appeals in Docket No. 54781 and Docket No. 55119 DISMISSED." | 11-01664 | |
01/18/2011 | Case Status Update | Case Closed/No Remittitur Issued. |