Case: 02-23-00364-CV
02-23-00364-CV
10/02/2023
Miscellaneous/other civil
Zachary Sadeghian Agent and Trustee of, KAMY Real Property Trust, KAMY Trust, Reram Inc., Kozamesa Inc., Kamy Investments LLC., Amy J. Sadeghian of KAMY Real Property Trust, ZFN Realty LLC
Denton Central Appraisal District
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
02/26/2024 | Electronic reply brief filed | Appellant |
| ||||
02/16/2024 | Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requested | Appellee |
| ||||
01/03/2024 | Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requested | Appellant |
|
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
03/01/2024 | Set for submission on briefs |
| |||||
02/26/2024 | Electronic reply brief filed |
| |||||
02/16/2024 | Case ready to be set | | |||||
02/16/2024 | Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requested |
| |||||
02/01/2024 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted |
| ||||
02/01/2024 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed |
| |||||
01/03/2024 | Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requested |
| |||||
12/06/2023 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted |
| ||||
12/06/2023 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed |
| |||||
11/14/2023 | Appearance of counsel | | |||||
11/08/2023 | Response filed | | |||||
11/08/2023 | Electronic Clerks Record Filed |
| |||||
10/31/2023 | Clerks notice to court regarding status of record |
| |||||
10/31/2023 | Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed | | |||||
10/27/2023 | Court reporters notice to court regarding status of record |
| |||||
10/25/2023 | Docketing statement filed | | |||||
10/23/2023 | Fee paid | | |||||
10/17/2023 | Notice of late docketing statement | | |||||
10/17/2023 | Notice of late filing fee |
| |||||
10/02/2023 | Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals |
|
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
03/22/2024 | Submission | Briefs |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
ZFN Realty LLC | Appellant | Nicholas R. Smith |
Denton Central Appraisal District | Appellee | Eric C. Farrar David B. Tabor |
Kamy Real Property Trust | Appellant | Nicholas R. Smith |
Reram Inc. | Appellant | Nicholas R. Smith |
Kozamesa, Inc. | Appellant | Nicholas R. Smith |
Sadeghian, Amy | Appellant | Nicholas R. Smith |
Sadeghian, Zachary | Appellant | Nicholas R. Smith |
Kamy Investments LLC | Appellant | Nicholas R. Smith |
Kamy Trust | Appellant | Nicholas R. Smith |
Trial Court Information
431st District Court
Denton
Honorable James S. Johnson
22-9874-431
Court Reporter, 431st District Court