Case Information: 55140 | |||
Short Caption: | IN RE: KATTIE M., A MINOR (CHILD CUSTODY) | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 51487 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Humboldt Co. - Sixth Judicial District - JV032191 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - Family Law - Child Custody/Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
12/28/2009 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee due. Filing fee will be fowarded by the Districy Court. | ||
12/28/2009 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person Pilot Program. (Pilot program civil appeals order and documents mailed to proper person appellant.) | 09-31318 | |
12/28/2009 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Horton Ensley, Jr. check no. 3030. | ||
02/09/2010 | Brief | Filed Civil Proper Person Appeal Statement. | 10-03623 | |
06/10/2010 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." NNP10-MC/NS/MG. | 10-15105 | |
07/09/2010 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 10-16929 | |
07/09/2010 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
07/14/2010 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on July 12, 2010. | 10-16929 |