Case: 02-23-00383-CV
02-23-00383-CV
10/12/2023
Contract
Frost Bank and Frost Brokerage Services, Inc.
Sturdi Packaging, Inc.; Sturdi Frost, L.P., as Successor in Interest to Sturdi Packaging, Inc.; and Chemcraft (Pty) Ltd.
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
03/04/2024 | Electronic reply brief filed | Appellee |
| ||||
02/05/2024 | Electronic reply brief filed | Appellant |
| ||||
01/08/2024 | Electronic brief filed - oral argument requested | Appellee |
| ||||
01/08/2024 | Electronic brief filed - oral argument requested | Appellee |
| ||||
11/27/2023 | Electronic brief filed - oral argument requested | Appellant |
|
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
03/05/2024 | Additional copies of documents received after initial filing |
| |||||
03/04/2024 | Additional copies of documents received after initial filing |
| |||||
03/04/2024 | Electronic reply brief filed |
| |||||
03/01/2024 | Additional copies of documents received after initial filing |
| |||||
03/01/2024 | Additional copies of documents received after initial filing |
| |||||
02/23/2024 | Motion disposed | Motion or Writ Granted |
| ||||
02/21/2024 | Response filed |
| |||||
02/16/2024 | Set for submission on briefs - oral argument denied |
| |||||
02/15/2024 | Motion filed |
| |||||
02/05/2024 | Electronic reply brief filed |
| |||||
02/02/2024 | Response filed |
| |||||
02/02/2024 | Response filed |
| |||||
01/29/2024 | Response filed |
| |||||
01/23/2024 | Motion for extension of time to file reply brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted |
| ||||
01/23/2024 | Letter issued by the court for lack of jurisdiction or defect |
| |||||
01/22/2024 | Motion for extension of time to file reply brief filed |
| |||||
01/18/2024 | Electronic Supplemental Clerks Record Filed |
| |||||
01/09/2024 | Case ready to be set | | |||||
01/08/2024 | Electronic brief filed - oral argument requested |
| |||||
01/08/2024 | Electronic brief filed - oral argument requested |
| |||||
12/06/2023 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted |
| ||||
12/05/2023 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed |
| |||||
11/27/2023 | Electronic brief filed - oral argument requested |
| |||||
10/30/2023 | Motion to appear pro hac vice disposed | Motion or Writ Granted |
| ||||
10/27/2023 | Electronic Supplemental Clerks Record Filed |
| |||||
10/26/2023 | Electronic Supplemental Clerks Record Filed |
| |||||
10/25/2023 | Motion in support of motion to appear pro hac vice filed |
| |||||
10/25/2023 | Motion to appear pro hac vice filed |
| |||||
10/25/2023 | Motion to appear pro hac vice filed |
| |||||
10/25/2023 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted |
| ||||
10/24/2023 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed |
| |||||
10/19/2023 | Docketing statement filed | | |||||
10/18/2023 | Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed |
| |||||
10/17/2023 | Fee paid |
| |||||
10/16/2023 | Electronic Clerks Record Filed |
| |||||
10/12/2023 | Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals |
|
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
03/12/2024 | Submission | Briefs |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Sturdi Packaging, Inc. | Appellee | Robert "Bob" E. Haslam Jason C. Nash Christian P. Di Ferrante Phillip B. Baldwin Jr. |
Frost Bank and Frost Brokerage Services, Inc. | Appellant | J. Nathaniel James Caroline M. Cyrier Roland K. Johnson |
Sturdi Frost, L.P. | Appellee | Robert "Bob" E. Haslam Christian P. Di Ferrante Jason C. Nash Phillip B. Baldwin Jr. |
Chemcraft (Pty) Ltd. | Appellee | Ethan Bryce Rodriguez Juan Jose Rodriguez Eugene M. Massad III Austin Champion |
Trial Court Information
96th District Court
Tarrant
Honorable J. Patrick Gallagher
096-340969-23
Court Reporter, 96th District Court