Case Information: 55141 | |||
Short Caption: | DREW VS. MANPOWER OF SO. NEV. | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 49334 , 51265 , 52082 , 52129 , 55337 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A486900 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - Family Law - Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
12/28/2009 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
12/28/2009 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person Pilot Program. (Pilot program civil appeals order and documents mailed to proper person appellant.) | 09-31319 | |
02/09/2010 | Brief | Filed Civil Proper Person Appeal Statement. | 10-03653 | |
04/09/2010 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Dismissing Appeal. "We dismiss this appeal." NNP10-MC/NS/MG | 10-09284 | |
05/05/2010 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 10-10008 | |
05/05/2010 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
05/17/2010 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on May 11, 2010. | 10-10008 |