Case Information: 51346 | |||
Short Caption: | MEDINA (ADRIAN) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 32131 , 38719 , 77375 , 77375-COA | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C142208 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Life - Post-Conviction |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 12/01/2008 | How Submitted: | On Briefs |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
03/28/2008 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
03/28/2008 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) | 08-07798 | |
04/04/2008 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 10/1/07 To Court Reporter: Mary Beth Cook. | 08-08523 | |
04/21/2008 | Docketing Statement | Received Docketing Statement. FILED PER ORDER OF 5/1/08. | 08-09900 | |
04/24/2008 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. | 08-10265 | |
05/01/2008 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Clerk's Order Granting Motion. The clerk shall file the docketing statement received on April 21, 2008. | 08-10844 | |
05/01/2008 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | 08-09900 | |
05/23/2008 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Mary Beth Cook stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 10/01/07. | 08-13109 | |
07/25/2008 | Motion | Filed Motion and Order Extending Time. Brief due: August 27, 2008. | 08-19253 | |
08/20/2008 | Brief | Filed Opening Brief. | 08-21431 | |
08/20/2008 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. | 08-21432 | |
09/24/2008 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. | 08-24651 | |
09/24/2008 | Brief | Received Answering Brief. FILED PER ORDER OF 9/30/08. | 08-24652 | |
09/30/2008 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Clerk's Order Granting Motion. The clerk shall file the answering brief received on September 24, 2008. Appellant: 30 days to file a reply brief, if deemed necessary. | 08-25233 | |
09/30/2008 | Brief | Filed Answering Brief. | 08-24652 | |
12/01/2008 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. No Reply Brief filed. | ||
02/04/2010 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." NNP10-MC/NS/MG | 10-03092 | |
03/02/2010 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 10-04241 | |
03/02/2010 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
03/11/2010 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on March 5, 2010. | 10-04241 |