Case: 02-24-00036-CV
02-24-00036-CV
01/19/2024
Termination of parental rights or conservatorship - accelerated
In the Interest of L.E., and P.E., Children
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
02/26/2024 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted |
| ||
02/22/2024 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed | | |||
02/22/2024 | Notice of late brief |
| |||
02/08/2024 | Docketing statement filed | | |||
02/05/2024 | Notice of late docketing statement |
| |||
01/29/2024 | Electronic Clerks Record Filed |
| |||
01/25/2024 | Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed |
| |||
01/19/2024 | Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals |
| |||
01/19/2024 | Case began in court of appeals | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
03/19/2024 | Status | Appellant brief due |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
E., P | Civil - Ad Litem | Devin AuClair |
E., C. | Appellee | W. Chandler Cramer |
E., L. | Civil - Ad Litem | Devin AuClair |
Texas Department of Family and Protective Services | Appellee | Steven W. Conder |
V., L. | Appellant | Melissa K. Swan |
Trial Court Information
322nd District Court
Tarrant
Honorable James B. Munford
322-727064-22
Court Reporter, 322nd District Court