Case Information: 51345 | |||
Short Caption: | FURER VS. THRONE C/W 51344 | Court: | Supreme Court |
Consolidated: | 51344 *, 51345 | Related Case(s): | 51198 , 51344 |
Lower Court Case(s): | Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - DV0401626 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - Family Law - Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 06/19/2009 | How Submitted: | |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
03/28/2008 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Robert W. Lueck, Ltd.--check no. 0213. | ||
03/28/2008 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. --SEALED-- Notice Re Settlement Conference Program and Suspension of Rules mailed to all counsel. (The requesting of transcripts and briefing are stayed pursuant to NRAP 16(a)(1). Docketing Statement Form mailed to counsel for appellant(s).) | 08-07793 | |
04/08/2008 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to File Documents. It has been determined that this appeal willl not be scheduled for settlement conference. Transcript request form due: 15 days. Opening Brief due: 120 days. | 08-08756 | |
05/09/2008 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to File Docketing Statement and Request Transcripts. | 08-11609 | |
05/20/2008 | Motion | Filed Motion. Motion to Withdraw as Counsel for the Appellant. | 08-12651 | |
06/06/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Granting Motion to Withdraw. The clerk shall remove Robert W. Lueck as counsel of record for appellant in this appeal. | 08-14285 | |
07/11/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Conditionally Imposing Sanctions. Conditional Sanction of $500.00 due: 15 days or docketing statement and transcript request form or motion due: 10 days. | 08-17797 | |
07/16/2008 | Motion | Filed Motion. Motion to Withdraw as Counsel for the Appellant. | 08-18251 | |
07/17/2008 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. Motion to Extend Time to File the Docketing Statement and Transcript Request Form. | 08-18414 | |
08/06/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. The clerk shall remove Jarien Cho and the Law Offices of Odgers & Cho as counsel for appellant on this court's docket. Appellant shall have 30 days from the date of this order to obtain new counsel and cause counsel to file a notice of appearance with this court. If appellant does not intend to retain new counsel, she shall so inform this court in writing within the same time period. Failure to retain new counsel may result in this appeal proceeding as a proper person appeal. Appellant has filed a motion for an extension of time to file the docketing statement and transcript request form. Cause appearing, we grant the motion to the following extent. Briefing and compliance with NRAP 9(a) and 14(b) are hereby suspended pending further order of this court. | 08-20328 | |
09/26/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. we consolidate these appeals for all appellate purposes. To date, appellant has not complied with our August 6, 2008, orders, or otherwise communicated with this court. We have decided to include these consolidated appeals in the pilot program. The clerk shall provide appellant with a Civil Proper Person Appeal Statement, a Civil Proper Person Transcript Request Form and the Instructions of Civil Litigants Without Attorneys. Appellant shall have 40 days from the date of this order to file and serve a single Civil Proper Person Appeal Statement in these consolidated appeals. Failure to file the statement within 40 days may result in the dismissal of these appeals. Respondents are not required to file responses to the Civil Proper Person Appeal Statement unless ordered to do so by this court. Nos. 51344/51345 [08-24910] | ||
10/10/2008 | Brief | Filed Civil Proper Person Appeal Statement. Appellant Furer. Nos. 51344/51345 (08-26232) | ||
10/10/2008 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Provide Proof of Service. Civil Proper Person Appeal Statement. Due date: 10 days. Nos. 51344/51345 (08-26233) | ||
11/05/2008 | Brief | Filed Civil Proper Person Appeal Statement. Amended. Appellant Furer. Nos. 51344/51345 (08-28319) | ||
03/27/2009 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Transmit Record. Record due in District Court Case no. DV0401626. 30 days. Nos. 51344/51345 (09-07744). | ||
04/24/2009 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. Affidavit for Extension of Time, submitted by district court clerk (in regards to the transmission of the Record on Appeal). Nos. 51344/51345. (09-10247) | ||
05/07/2009 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Granting Motion to Extend Time. Record on Appeal due: 45 days. Nos. 51344/51345 (09-11320). | ||
06/19/2009 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal Copy. Vol. 1 of 3. Nos. 51344/51345. [09-15379] | ||
06/19/2009 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal Copy. Vol. 2 of 3. Nos. 51344/51345. [09-15380] | ||
06/19/2009 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal Copy. Vol. 3 of 3. Nos. 51344/51345. [09-15382] | ||
06/19/2009 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed District Court Documents. Index to Record. Nos. 51344/51345. [09-15383] | ||
06/19/2009 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed District Court Minutes. Nos. 51344/51345. [09-15384] | ||
06/19/2009 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
07/07/2009 | Order/Incoming | Filed District Court Order. Certified copy of order filed in district court on June 29, 2009. (SEALED). Nos. 51344/51345 (09-16641). | ||
06/10/2010 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." NNP10-MC/NS/MG | 10-15037 | |
07/09/2010 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 10-16933 | |
07/09/2010 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
07/26/2010 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on July 14, 2010. | 10-16933 |