judyrecords
search tips
720 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

ZEN JUICE, INC. VS. SILVERADO RANCH ABCF, LLC C/W 56032

Case Information: 55138
Short Caption:ZEN JUICE, INC. VS. SILVERADO RANCH ABCF, LLC C/W 56032Court:Supreme Court
Consolidated:55138*, 56032 Related Case(s): 56032
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A554530Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:01/05/2010 / Buchanan, WilliamSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
12/28/2009Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice Re Settlement Conference Program and Suspension of Rules mailed to all counsel. (The requesting of transcripts and briefing are stayed pursuant to NRAP 16(a)(1). Docketing Statement Form mailed to counsel for appellant(s).) 09-31310
12/28/2009Filing Fee Filing Fee due. Filing fee will be fowarded by the District Court.
12/28/2009Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Second NOA filed in district court on 12/23/09. (TRANSFERRED AS A NEW CASE TO DOCKET NO. 56032 PER ORDER 05/14/10).
12/30/2009Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Alexander, Odunze & Kang. Check No. 1221.
01/05/2010Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: William F. Buchanan 10-00241
01/14/2010Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for 2/15/10 10-01210
01/21/2010Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 10-01686
02/22/2010Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. 10-04732
02/22/2010Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. 10-04733
02/26/2010Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: March 18, 2010. 10-05193
03/10/2010Notice/OutgoingIssued Letter. addressed to Ikenna K. Odunze returning check no. 1217. 10-06155
03/18/2010Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 10-07183
03/22/2010Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 10-07509
03/23/2010Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: 4/1/10 10-07581
04/05/2010Settlement Program ReportFiled Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. 10-08755
04/12/2010Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellant: 15 days to request transcripts; 90 days to file and serve opening brief and appendix. 10-09456
05/10/2010MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Motion for Extension of the Time to Order & Submit Transcripts & Otherwise Comply with NRAP 9. 10-12130
05/14/2010Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Directing Clerk to Assign Appeal to New Docket and Order to Show Cause. We direct the clerk of this court to assign the amended notice of appeal docketed in this appeal on December 28, 2009, to a new docket. The clerk shall then consolidate the newly docketed appeal with this appeal. Filing Fee due: 10 days. Appellant's response to order to show cause due: 30 days. Briefing is suspended. Respondents may file any reply within ten days from the date that appellants' response is served. Nos. 55138/56032. 10-12526
05/24/2010Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Filing fee due: June 1, 2010. Nos. 55138/56032. 10-13438
05/26/2010Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Denying as Moot Motion for Extension of Time File Transcript Request Form. Nos. 55138/56032. 10-13628
07/06/2010MotionFiled Stipulation/Dismiss Appeal. Stipulation for Dismissal with Prejudice. Nos. 55138/56032. 10-17464
07/07/2010Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Certificate of Service 10-17593
09/16/2010Order/ProceduralFiled Order Regarding Filing Fee. Filing Fee due: 5 days. Nos. 55138/56032. 10-23859
09/29/2010Order/DispositionalOrder Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." Nso. 55138/56032. 10-25083
10/26/2010RemittiturIssued Remittitur. Nos. 55138/56032 10-27952
10/26/2010Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. Nos. 55138/56032
11/03/2010Order/ProceduralFiled Order Referring Counsel to State Bar. State Bar Status Report due: 90 days. fn1[The clerk of this court shall provide bar counsel with copies of this court's May 14 and September 16, 2010, orders.] Nos. 55138/56032. 10-28788
11/04/2010Letter/IncomingFiled Letter (via fax) addressed to Office of Bar Counsel from attorney Patrick Kang stating that he is no longer counsel in this matter. Nos. 55138/56032 10-28934
11/17/2010RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on November 3, 2010. Nos. 55138/56032 10-27952
02/01/2011Notice/IncomingFiled Investigative Report from State Bar of Nevada re attorney Patrick Kang. NOTE: This original document was placed in attorney Kang's bar file. Not entered into SIRE.
05/03/2011Letter/IncomingFiled Letter from Phillip Odunze regarding the filing fee. 11-13087
05/03/2011Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $250.00 from I. Phillip Odunze - Money Order No. 0194738775.
10/27/2011Notice/IncomingFiled Supplemental Report of Bar Counsel in re: Patrick Kang.