Case Information: 55137 | |||
Short Caption: | BAILEY (ANTHONY) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 54557 , 55430 , 55663 , 56592 , 56748 , 57789 , 58235 , 58406 , 59948 , 60144 , 64599 , 65989 , 67108 , 71409 , 72405 , 72405-COA , 75489 , 75489-COA , 77166 , 77166-COA , 79322 , 80128 , 80128-COA , 80129 , 80129-COA | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C253437 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Other - Other/Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
12/28/2009 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | 09-31303 | |
12/28/2009 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
02/03/2010 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." NNP10-MC/NS/MG fn1[We deny the motion for leave to proceed pursuant to NRAP 46(b).] | 10-02962 | |
03/02/2010 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 10-04355 | |
03/02/2010 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
03/11/2010 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on March 5, 2010. | 10-04355 |