judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

CRESCENT H HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION, INC v. CRESCENT H ASSOCIATION OF HOMEOWNERS, INC. and JONES HOLDINGS, LLC, a Wyoming Limited Liability Company

Case Heading (S-07-0275)
Case Number:S-07-0275Case Docketed On:12/03/2007
Status:Closed
Original Court:Ninth Judicial District Teton CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Property, Conveyances and Security Transactions (Title 34)
Short Title:CRESCENT H HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION, INC v. CRESCENT H ASSOCIATION OF HOMEOWNERS, INC. and JONES HOLDINGS, LLC, a Wyoming Limited Liability Company
Full Title:CRESCENT H HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION, INC., Appellant (Plaintiff), v. CRESCENT H ASSOCIATION OF HOMEOWNERS, INC., Appellee (Defendant), and JONES HOLDINGS, LLC, a Wyoming Limited Liability Company, Appellee (Intervenor-Defendant).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantCrescent H Homeowners Association, Inc.William Phillip Schwartz
Brent R. Cohen
AppelleeCrescent H Association of Homeowners, Inc.Jessica Rutzick
AppelleeJones Holdings, LLCAndrea L. Richard
Jennifer Ann Golden

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Contracts, Property -Servitudes
Opinion Number:2009 WY 153
Citation:222 P.3d 134

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
12/03/2007Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
12/03/2007Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
12/03/2007Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
12/03/2007Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
12/03/2007Notice-Internal - Recusal memo from Justice GoldenNotice-InternalRecusal memoFinal
01/17/2008Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
02/29/2008Brief - Appellee - Crescent H AssociationBriefAppelleeFinal
03/04/2008Brief - Appellee Jones Holdings, LLCBriefAppelleeFinal
03/17/2008Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
03/24/2008Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
03/28/2008Notice-Incoming - Amended indexNotice-IncomingAmended indexFinal
04/02/2008Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
04/04/2008Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
04/04/2008Record - Transmitted record on appeal, five volumes. Volumes I-IV, original records; Volume V, exhibits.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
04/04/2008Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
04/07/2008Order - Assignment of judge - recusing Justice Golden, assigning Nena James, District Judge.OrderAssignment of judge/justiceFinal
04/09/2008Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - William P. Schwartz and Brent R. Coehn for appellant.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
04/28/2008Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Jennifer Golden for appellee Jones Holdings; and Jessica Rutzick for appellee Crescent H. Association of Homeowners.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
05/13/2008Event - Oral argument presented - Argued before Chief Justice Voigt, Justices Hill, Kite and Burke, and District Judge James (Brent Cohen for appellant; Jennifer Ann Golden, Andrea L. Richard, and Jessica Rutzick, argument by Ms. Golden and Ms. Rutzick for appellees) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
05/13/2008Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
12/14/2009Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Burke writing for the Court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
12/30/2009Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
12/30/2009Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
12/30/2009Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
12/30/2009Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
01/06/2010Service - Certified mail signature return cardServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal