judyrecords
search tips
720 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

POTOMAC CONSTRUCTION COMPANY V. DC DEP'T OF TRANSPORTATION

Case Information: 10-AA-1145
Short Caption:POTOMAC CONSTRUCTION COMPANY V. DC DEP'T OF TRANSPORTATIONClassification:Agency - Administrative Agency - OAH - Dept of Transportation
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:OAH-DDOT127-09Filed Date:09/13/2010

Opening Event Date:09/13/2010Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:11/09/2010

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
PetitionerPotomac Construction CompanyNPro SeN
RespondentDistrict of Columbia Department of TransportationN
Todd S. KimNY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
09/13/2010PETITION FOR REVIEW
09/13/2010FILING FEE $100.00.
09/13/2010CERTIFIED COPY OF PETITION TO BOARD, OAH and Todd Kim, Esq.
09/20/2010 On consideration of the petition for review in this matter, and it appearing that Potomac Construction Co, Inc. is a business that must be represented by counsel, it is ORDERED that petitioner shall within 15 days from the date of this order advise this court as to the identity of its counsel. See Moore Energy Resources, Inc. v. Public Serv. Comm'n of the District of Columbia, 785 A.2d 300, 304 (D.C. 2001); D.C. App. R. 15 (A)(5). Failure to comply with this order shall subject this petition for review to dismissal without further notice. (JAC)
10/13/2010ORDER: This appeal is hereby dismissed. See D.C. App. R. 13. (By: ETW)
10/13/2010DISMISSED
11/09/2010MANDATE ISSUED
04/17/2014FiledArchived