judyrecords
search tips
720 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

C.R. HOMES, INC. VS. DIST. CT. (GAYLER)

Case Information: 55151
Short Caption:C.R. HOMES, INC. VS. DIST. CT. (GAYLER)Court:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Nye Co. - Fifth Judicial District - CV25227Classification:Original Proceeding - Civil - Mandamus/Prohibition
Disqualifications:Cherry, SaittaCase Status:Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Senior Justice Rose for Justice Saitta
Senior Justice Shearing for Justice Cherry
Panel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:04/04/2011 at 11:30 AMOral Argument Location:Carson City
Submission Date:04/04/2011How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
12/29/2009Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Lemons Grundy & Eisenberg check no. 20078.
12/29/2009Petition/WritFiled Petition for Writ of Mandamus or Prohibition. 09-31481
12/29/2009AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ. Volume 1. 09-31482
12/29/2009AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ. Volume 2. 09-31483
02/25/2010Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Directing Answer: Due 30 days. 10-04988
02/25/2010Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Justice Disqualification. The Honorables Michael Cherry and Nancy Saitta, Justices, have voluntarily recused themselves from participation in this matter. (Sat in district court proceedings.) 10-05032
03/08/2010Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Notice of Firm Name Change (Pusiano Law Group now known as Pursiano Barry Lavelle LLP.) 10-06031
03/25/2010Petition/WritFiled Answer to Petition for Writ. 10-07797
03/25/2010AppendixFiled Appendix. Appendix to Answer of Real Parties in Interest. 10-07802
04/12/2010MotionFiled Motion for Permission to File Document. Motion for Permission to File Reply. 10-09475
04/19/2010MotionFiled Response to Motion. Opposition to C.R. Homes' Motion for Permission to File Reply. 10-10168
05/06/2010Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Granting Motion for Leave to File Reply. Petitioner: Reply due 10 days. 10-11707
05/14/2010Petition/WritFiled Reply to Answer to Petition. Reply in Support of Petition for Writ. 10-12514
05/14/2010AppendixFiled Appendix. Supplemental Appendix to Petition for Writ 10-12515
07/20/2010Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Notice of Firm Name Change. New name Pursiano Barry Lavelle Bruce Hassin, LLP 10-18729
11/09/2010Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral argument is scheduled for December 7, 2010 at 10:30 a.m. for 30 minutes before the En Banc Court in Las Vegas. 10-29313
11/10/2010MotionFiled Motion to Postpone Oral Argument (Presently Scheduled for December 7, 2010). 10-29479
11/16/2010Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. The oral argument presently scheduled for December 7, 2010, at 10:30 a.m. is hereby vacated. The clerk of this court is directed to schedule this appeal for oral argument on the next available calendar. Argument shall be limited to 30 minutes. 10-29901
12/15/2010Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral argument is scheduled for February 7, 2011 at 11:30 a.m. in Carson City for 30 minutes before the En Banc Court. 10-32801
01/18/2011Order/ProceduralFiled Order instructing counsel to prepare to discuss specific issues during oral argument. 11-01613
01/24/2011Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. 11-02367
01/28/2011MotionFiled Motion to Postpone Oral Argument. 11-02794
01/28/2011Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of No Opposition to Motion to Continue Oral Argument. 11-02849
02/01/2011MotionFiled Amended Motion to Postpone Oral Argument. 11-03164
02/01/2011Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion to Postpone Oral Argument. We vacate the oral argument presently scheduled for February 7, 2011, at 11:30 a.m., and direct the clerk of this court to schedule this matter for oral argument before the full court on the next available calendar. 11-03180
02/17/2011Order/ProceduralFiled Order of Assignment. The Honorable Michael A. Cherry, Justice, having voluntarily recused himself in the above entitled matter, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Honorable Miriam Shearing, Senior Justice, is assigned to participate in the determination of this matter in the place of Justice Cherry. 11-05129
03/08/2011Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral argument is scheduled for April 4, 2011, at 11:30 a.m. in Carson City for 30 minutes before the En Banc Court. 11-07167
03/15/2011Order/ProceduralFiled Order instructing counsel to prepare to address specific issues during oral argument. 11-07877
03/21/2011Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. 11-08667
04/04/2011Case Status UpdateOral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before the En Banc Court.
05/09/2011Order/ProceduralFiled Order of Assignment. The Honorable Robert E. Rose, Senior Justice, is assigned to participate in the determination of this matter in the place of Justice Saitta. 11-13590
09/22/2011Order/DispositionalFiled Order Denying Petition. "We deny the petition." fn1[The Honorable Miriam Shearing, Senior Justice, and the Honorable Robert E. Rose, Senior Justice, were appointed by the court to sit in the places of the Honorable Michael A. Cherry, Justice, and the Honorable Nancy M. Saitta, Justice, respectively, who voluntarily recused themselves from participation in the decision of this matter.] Pickering, J., with whom Hardesty and Parraguirre, JJ., agree, dissenting. 11-28962
10/17/2011RemittiturIssued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur 11-31884
10/17/2011Case Status UpdateNotice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed