Case: 05-24-00123-CV
05-24-00123-CV
02/06/2024
Miscellaneous/other civil
Lauren Rochon-Eidsvig and Heidi Rochon Hafer
JGB Collateral, LLC, as agent
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
03/04/2024 | Record due | | |||||
02/27/2024 | Fee paid |
| |||||
02/23/2024 | Fee requested |
| |||||
02/14/2024 | Electronic Clerks Record Filed |
| |||||
02/08/2024 | Notice received | | |||||
02/07/2024 | Docketing statement due |
| |||||
02/07/2024 | Fee requested |
| |||||
02/07/2024 | Letter issued by the court |
| |||||
02/06/2024 | Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals |
| |||||
02/05/2024 | Notice of appeal filed in trial court | | |||||
01/04/2024 | Judgment signed by trial court judge | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
03/15/2024 | Status | Appellant brief due |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
JGB Collateral, LLC | Appellee | Jeffrey S. Lowenstein Gwen Irene Walraven David G. Webster |
Lauren Rochon-Eidsvig and Heidi Rochon Hafer | Appellant | Heidi Rochon Hafer |
Trial Court Information
160th Judicial District Court
Dallas
Honorable Aiesha Redmond
DC-20-19011
Brooke Wagner