Case Information: 55134 | |||
Short Caption: | MORALES (THOMAS) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C254176 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
12/28/2009 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) | 09-31293 | |
12/28/2009 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
12/28/2009 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to File Rough Draft Transcript Request. Due date: 10 days. | 09-31294 | |
01/07/2010 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Transcripts requested: 8/17/09 and 8/18/09. Court Reporter: Renee Silvaggio. Filed in district court on: no date. | 10-00467 | |
02/05/2010 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Statement. | 10-03293 | |
02/05/2010 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Statement. | 10-03294 | |
02/08/2010 | Transcript | Filed Transcript. Proceedings: 8/17/09 and 8/18/09. Court Reporter: JoAnn Orduna. | 10-03582 | |
02/24/2010 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Response. Fast Track Response | 10-04978 | |
07/19/2010 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED." SNP10-JH/MD/KP | 10-18349 | |
08/13/2010 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 10-19219 | |
08/13/2010 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
08/20/2010 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on August 17, 2010. | 10-19219 |