Case Information: 55156 | |||
Short Caption: | CARCANO (JOSE) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 46980 , 55785 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C216067 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
12/29/2009 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | 09-31492 | |
12/29/2009 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
02/03/2010 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." NNP10-MC/NS/MG | 10-02965 | |
03/02/2010 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 10-04357 | |
03/02/2010 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
03/11/2010 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on March 5, 2010. | 10-04357 |