Case Information: 55155 | |||
Short Caption: | HILFORD (ANDREW) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C231954 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Life - Post-Conviction |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 08/04/2010 | How Submitted: | |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
12/29/2009 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | 09-31490 | |
12/29/2009 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
01/20/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Temporary Remand. for appointment of counsel. Order due: 35 days. | 10-01655 | |
02/08/2010 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed District Court Minutes. Appointment of Counsel. Representing Appellant, Betsy Allen, Esq. | 10-03570 | |
02/08/2010 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Appointed Counsel. Docketing statement due: 20 days. Request for transcripts: 15 days. Opening brief: 120 days. | 10-03574 | |
02/22/2010 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. | 10-04639 | |
03/09/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Appellant: Transcript Request Form and Docketing Statement due: 10 days. | 10-06130 | |
03/15/2010 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | 10-06844 | |
03/16/2010 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proof of Service. -Docketing Statement. | 10-06970 | |
04/12/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Transcript Request Form due: 10 days. | 10-09409 | |
04/21/2010 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 11/13/09. To Court Reporter: Rachelle Hamilton. | 10-10354 | |
04/26/2010 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Rachelle Hamilton stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 11/13/09. | 10-10776 | |
05/21/2010 | Brief | Filed Opening Brief. | 10-13331 | |
06/16/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Paper copy of the appendix due: 15 days. | 10-15672 | |
06/21/2010 | Brief | Filed Answering Brief. | 10-16176 | |
06/22/2010 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Answering Brief. | 10-16259 | |
06/22/2010 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. | 10-16297 | |
06/25/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Denying Motion. for Re-Appointment of New Counsel. We direct the clerk of this court to file the motion received on June 21, 2010. Appellant shall address all concerns regarding this appeal to court-appointed counsel. | 10-16688 | |
06/25/2010 | Motion | Filed Proper Person Motion. for Re-appointment of New Counsel. | 10-16149 | |
08/04/2010 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. No reply brief filed. | ||
11/16/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order to File Supplemental Appendix. Appellant's Appendix due: 20 days. | 10-29900 | |
12/14/2010 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Amended Appendix. (CD Included). | 10-32733 | |
01/13/2011 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." | 11-01332 | |
02/07/2011 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 11-03806 | |
02/07/2011 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
02/17/2011 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on February 14, 2011. | 11-03806 |