Case Information: 55120 | |||
Short Caption: | WILLIAMS-KEPFORD VS. WILLIAMS FAMILY TRUST | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 57603 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - 08P064465 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - Family Law - Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
12/22/2009 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee due. | ||
12/22/2009 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person Pilot Program. (Pilot program civil appeals order and documents mailed to proper person appellant.) | 09-31023 | |
01/08/2010 | Transcript Request | Filed Civil Proper Person Transcript Request Form. | 10-00718 | |
01/08/2010 | Other Incoming Document | Filed Proper Person Document. -Letter from appellant informing the court that a motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis has been filed in district court. | 10-00720 | |
01/28/2010 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Barbara W. Kepford. Check No. 1127. | ||
01/28/2010 | Other Incoming Document | Filed Proper Person Document. Letter from Appellant regarding her filing of In Forma Pauperis and that she has filed for Bankruptcy. | 10-02413 | |
02/03/2010 | Brief | Filed Civil Proper Person Appeal Statement. | 10-03052 | |
03/10/2010 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Dismissing Appeal. As we lack jurisdiction to conisder this appeal, "we dismiss it." SNP10-JH/MD/KP | 10-06185 | |
04/05/2010 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 10-06763 | |
04/05/2010 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
04/13/2010 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on April 8, 2010. | 10-06763 |