Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
12/22/2009 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice Re Settlement Conference Program and Suspension of Rules mailed to all counsel. (The requesting of transcripts and briefing are stayed pursuant to NRAP 16(a)(1). Docketing Statement Form mailed to counsel for appellant(s).) | | 09-31022 |
12/22/2009 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee due. Filing fee will be fowarded by the District Court. | | |
12/23/2009 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Burton, Bartlett & Glogovac - check no. 19894. | | |
12/31/2009 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Laurie Yott | | 09-31622 |
01/05/2010 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. Appellant's Docketing Statement Civil Appeals | | 10-00254 |
01/06/2010 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Madelyn Shipman | | 10-00312 |
01/27/2010 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled. | | 10-02260 |
03/10/2010 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. | | 10-06306 |
03/12/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Briefing Reinstated. Request for Transcripts due: 15 days. Opening Brief and Appendix due: 90 days. | | 10-06644 |
03/29/2010 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 11/16/09. To Court Reporter: Capitol Reporters. | | 10-08183 |
03/29/2010 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 10/5/09 through 10/9/09. To Court Reporter: Julietta Forbes. | | 10-08184 |
03/29/2010 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 5/13/09. To Court Reporter: Stacy Winn. | | 10-08185 |
03/30/2010 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed District Court Docket Entries. | | 10-08234 |
04/05/2010 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed District Court Docket Entries. Updated docket sheet. | | 10-08707 |
04/26/2010 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Julietta Forbes stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: October 5, 6, 7, and 9, 2009. | | 10-10685 |
04/27/2010 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed District Court Docket Entries. Updated docket sheet. | | 10-10799 |
04/27/2010 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed District Court Docket Entries. Updated. | | 10-10833 |
04/28/2010 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed District Court Docket Entries. Updated Docket Sheet. | | 10-10895 |
05/13/2010 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed District Court Docket Entries. | | 10-12429 |
05/14/2010 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed District Court Docket Entries. | | 10-12573 |
06/03/2010 | Brief | Filed Opening Brief. | | 10-14275 |
06/03/2010 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. Vols. 1 through 8. | | 10-14276 |
06/29/2010 | Motion | Filed Stipulation and Order. Brief due: July 30, 2010. | | 10-16985 |
07/23/2010 | Brief | Filed Answering Brief. | | 10-19047 |
08/19/2010 | Motion | Filed Motion and Order Extending Time. Brief due: September 23, 2010. | | 10-21318 |
09/20/2010 | Brief | Filed Reply Brief. | | 10-24097 |
09/20/2010 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Reply Brief. Appellant's Supplemental Appendix. | | 10-24098 |
09/21/2010 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Supplement to Reply Brief. | | 10-24274 |
12/10/2010 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Second Supplement to Reply Brief. | | 10-32233 |
01/24/2011 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Directing Clerk to Schedule Oral Argument. The clerk of this court is directed to schedule this matter for oral argument before a panel of this court on the next available calendar. The argument shall be limited to 30 minutes. | | 11-02359 |
02/10/2011 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral argument is scheduled for March 16, 2011 at 10:30 a.m. for 30 minutes in Carson City before the Northern Nevada Panel. NNP11-MC/MG/KP | | 11-04352 |
03/03/2011 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. | | 11-06626 |
03/16/2011 | Case Status Update | Oral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision to the Northern Nevada Panel. NNP11-MC/MG/KP | | |
04/27/2011 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." PICKERING, J., dissenting. (VACATED PER ORDER FILED 9/12/11) | | 11-12418 |
05/10/2011 | Filing Fee | E-Payment $150.00 from Gregory J. Livingston. | | |
05/10/2011 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Petition for Rehearing. Appellant's Petition for Panel Rehearing Nevada Rule of Appellate Procedure Rule 40. | | 11-13768 |
05/10/2011 | Motion | Filed Motion to Publish Decision. | | 11-13840 |
05/20/2011 | Post-Judgment Order | Filed Order Denying Rehearing. "Rehearing Denied." NRAP 40(c). Pickering, J. dissenting. | | 11-14904 |
05/27/2011 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Petition for En Banc Reconsideration. Petition for En Banc Rehearing - Nevada Rules of Appellate Procedure, Rule 40A. | | 11-15677 |
06/02/2011 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Directing Answer to Petition for En Banc Reconsideration. Respondent's Answer due: 15 days. | | 11-16113 |
06/13/2011 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Answer to Petition for En Banc Reconsideration. | | 11-17554 |
08/18/2011 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Appellant's Request to Supplement Petition for En Banc Rehearing. | | 11-25174 |
08/18/2011 | Filing Fee | E-Payment $150.00 from Gregory J. Livingston. (FILING FEE NOT REQUIRED--REFUNDED BY ACCOUNTING). | | |
09/12/2011 | Post-Judgment Order | Filed Order Granting Petition for En Banc Reconsideration. This appeal is reinstated and the order of affirmance entered on April 27, 2011, is hereby vacated. The clerk of this court is directed to schedule this appeal for argument before the en banc court on the next available argument calendar. | | 11-27570 |
09/12/2011 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral argument is scheduled for November 1, 2011, at 11:30 a.m. for 30 minutes in Carson City before the En Banc Court. | | 11-27617 |
09/13/2011 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order instructing counsel to prepare to address specific issues during oral argument. | | 11-27805 |
10/18/2011 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. | | 11-32161 |
10/21/2011 | Motion | Filed Motion for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief in Support of Appellant (Livery Operators Association). | | 11-32645 |
10/25/2011 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Appearance. (Michael K. Wall of Hutchison & Steffen as counsel for Nevada Capital Insurance Company). | | 11-32978 |
10/25/2011 | Motion | Filed Motion for Leave to File Amicus Brief. (Attached is Nevada Capital Insurance Company's Amicus Brief) (DETACHED AMICUS BRIEF AND RETURNED UNFILED PER ORDER 12/9/11) | | 11-32979 |
11/01/2011 | Case Status Update | Oral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before the En Banc Court. | | |
11/15/2011 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Denying Motion for Publication. | | 11-35195 |
12/09/2011 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Denying Motions for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Briefs. The clerk of this court shall return, unfiled, The Livery Operators' proposed amicus brief, which was provisionally recevied in this court on October 21, 2011, and Nevada Capital Insurance Company's proposed amicus brief, which is attached to its October 25, 2011, motion. | | 11-37792 |
06/28/2012 | Opinion/Dispositional | Filed Authored Opinion. "Reversed and remanded." Before the Court EN BANC. Author: Hardesty, J. Majority: Hardesty/Douglas/Saitta/Pickering/Parraguirre. Concurrence: Gibbons/Cherry. 128 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 33 EN BANC | | 12-20318 |
07/23/2012 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | | 12-23137 |
07/23/2012 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | | |
07/26/2012 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on July 24, 2012. | | 12-23137 |
07/27/2012 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed District Court Updated Docket Entries. | | 12-23794 |