judyrecords
search tips
720 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

KENNAMETAL INC. VS. KINDER MORGAN ENERGY PARTNERS

Case Information: 55116
Short Caption:KENNAMETAL INC. VS. KINDER MORGAN ENERGY PARTNERSCourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 42889 , 42990 , 59651 , 60653
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CV0303482Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:01/05/2010 / Berry, RobertSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
12/22/2009Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice Re Settlement Conference Program and Suspension of Rules mailed to all counsel. (The requesting of transcripts and briefing are stayed pursuant to NRAP 16(a)(1). Docketing Statement Form mailed to counsel for appellant(s).) 09-31008
12/22/2009Filing Fee Filing Fee due.
12/22/2009Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. Due Date: 10 days 09-31021
12/23/2009Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Jenkins & Carter check no. 12070.
01/05/2010Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Robert G. Berry 10-00215
01/08/2010Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 10-00716
01/08/2010Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Provide Proof of Service on Settlement Judge. - Docketing Statement. 10-00721
01/12/2010Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. Docketing Statement on Settlement Judge. 10-00925
02/11/2010MotionFiled Motion to Dismiss Appeal. Dismissal Agreement and Joint Motion to Dismiss Appeal. 10-03847
02/11/2010Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. -Dismissal Agreement and Joint Motion to Dismiss Appeal. 10-03853
02/18/2010Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. 55116 and 55122. Appellant has filed a motion to dismiss these appeals. 10-04394
02/26/2010Order/DispositionalFiled Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the stipulation of the parties, " . . . this appeal is dismissed." The parties shall bear their own costs and attorney fees. NRAP 42(b). NNP-TH 10-05185
02/26/2010Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.