judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

HERZ VS. RICHARDS

Case Information: 36298
Short Caption:HERZ VS. RICHARDSCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Douglas Co. - Ninth Judicial District - 98CV0176Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:06/22/2000 / Susich, J.SP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
06/16/2000Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Evan Beavers & Associates, PC--check no. 1538.
06/16/2000Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 00-10297
06/22/2000Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: J. Thomas Susich. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts and docketing statement suspended pending further order of this court.)
07/27/2000Settlement Program Motion/StipulationFiled Settlement Program/Stipulated Dismissal. Notice of Settlement Conference. Settlement Conference is scheduled for September 28, 2000. 00-13082
08/07/2000MotionFiled Motion. Motion for Stay of Judgment and Approval of Supersedeas Bond. 00-13588
08/10/2000MotionFiled Response to Motion. Opposition to Motion for Stay of Judgment and Approval of Supersedeas Bond; Affidavit of Alan Richards. 00-13976
08/25/2000MotionFiled Motion. Supplemental Motion to Expedite Review. 00-14950
08/28/2000MotionFiled Response to Motion. Opposition to Supplemental Motion to Expedite Review. 00-15103
09/14/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. We have considered appellants' motion for a stay pending appeal, and we are not persuaded that a stay is warranted at this time. Accordingly, we deny appellants' motion. [fn1] In light of our order, we deny as moot appellants' supplemental motion to expedite review. 00-16269
09/29/2000Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: October 17, 2000. 00-17271
11/01/2000Settlement Program Motion/StipulationFiled Settlement Program/Stipulated Dismissal. 00-19228
11/13/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the settlement conference held in this matter and the stipulation of the parties, " . . . this appeal is dismissed." The parties shall bear their own costs. NNP/CLK 00-19811
11/13/2000Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.