judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas 14th Court Of Appeals Record

Cushman & Wakefield U.S., Inc. and Darrin Boyd v. Sharestates Investments, LLC and Pallasite REO 2018-1, LLC

Case: 14-22-00155-CV
14-22-00155-CV
03/09/2022
Miscellaneous/other civil
Cushman & Wakefield U.S., Inc. and Darrin Boyd
Sharestates Investments, LLC and Pallasite REO 2018-1, LLC
No
www.txcourts.gov/14thcoa
Appellate Briefs
Date Event Type Description Document
10/03/2022Reply brief filedAppellant
08/23/2022Brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellee
05/03/2022Brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellant
05/02/2022Brief returned for non-compliance with T.R.A.P.Appellant
Case Events
Date Event Type Disposition Document
10/05/2023Case stored
10/05/2023Mandate issued
10/05/2023Mandate due to be issued
09/11/2023Petition for review was not filed
09/11/2023Petition for review due in Supreme Court
08/11/2023Motion for rehearing was not filed
08/11/2023Motion for rehearing enbanc due
08/11/2023Motion for rehearing due
07/27/2023Memorandum opinion issuedREVERSED AND REMANDED
07/27/2023Judgment Issued
11/02/2022Submitted
11/01/2022Letter filed
10/28/2022Oral argument exhibits filed
10/28/2022Oral argument exhibits filed
10/21/2022Confirmation of oral argument & counsel presenting oral argument
10/03/2022Reply brief filed
10/03/2022Reply brief due
09/28/2022Set for submission on oral argument
09/20/2022Motion for extension of time to file reply brief disposedGRANTED
09/12/2022Motion to file reply brief filed
09/07/2022Motion for extension of time to file reply brief filed
09/01/2022Reply brief due
08/25/2022Motion for extension of time to file reply brief disposedGRANTED
08/23/2022Case ready to be set
08/23/2022Brief filed - oral argument requested
08/12/2022Supplemental clerks record filed
08/02/2022Motion to appear pro hac vice disposedGRANTED
07/27/2022Document returned
07/22/2022Motion for extension of time to file reply brief filed
07/15/2022Motion to appear pro hac vice filed
07/05/2022Letter issued by the court
06/22/2022Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
06/22/2022Appellees brief due
05/23/2022Appellees brief due
05/17/2022Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedGRANTED
05/17/2022Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
05/04/2022Appellants brief due
05/03/2022Brief filed - oral argument requested
05/02/2022Brief returned for non-compliance with T.R.A.P.
05/02/2022Appellants brief due
04/11/2022Appellants brief due
04/04/2022Response due
04/01/2022Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedGRANTED
04/01/2022Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
03/29/2022Reporters record filed
03/24/2022Docketing statement due
03/21/2022Response filed
03/21/2022Clerks record filed
03/21/2022Court fee due
03/18/2022No payment arrangements made with trial court clerk for record
03/17/2022Clerks record due
03/17/2022Record due
03/14/2022Docketing statement filed
03/14/2022Fee paid
03/09/2022Reporters record filed
03/09/2022Letter issued by the court
03/09/2022Letter issued by the court
03/09/2022Case began in court of appeals
03/07/2022Notice of appeal filed in trial court
03/07/2022Request for findings of fact and conclusions of law
02/15/2022Judgment signed by trial court judge
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
10/05/2023Case StoredCase stored
10/05/2029RetentionDate civil case will be destroyed (6 yrs after mandate)
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Sharestates Investments, LLC and Pallasite REO 2018-1, LLCAppelleeWilliam M Rudow
Casey Jon Lambright
Cushman & Wakefield U.S., Inc. and Darrin BoydAppellantSawnie A. McEntire
Pamela C. Hicks
Scott Davis
Michael A. Walsh
Robert Rosen
Shawn McKee
Trial Court Information
152nd District Court
Harris
Honorable Judge, 152nd District Court
2020-04844
Court Reporter, 152nd District Court