Case Information: 55136 | |||
Short Caption: | JENKINS (ROGER) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 55192 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C254778 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
12/28/2009 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) | 09-31297 | |
12/28/2009 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
01/04/2010 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Transcripts requested: 10/05/09, 10/06/09, 10/07/09, 10/08/09, 10/09/09, and 11/23/09. Court Reporter: Jessica Ramirez. Filed in district court on: 12/22/09. | 10-00141 | |
01/07/2010 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. Motion for Extension of Time to File Transcript. | 10-00425 | |
01/11/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. for extension of time. Ms. Ramirez: Certificate of acknowledgment due 2/10/10. Fast track statement and appendix due: 3/2/10. | 10-00831 | |
02/16/2010 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Jessica Ramirez stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 10/05/09, 10/06/09, 10/07/09, 10/08/09, 10/09/09, and 11/23/09. | 10-04108 | |
03/02/2010 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Statement. Vols. 1 thru 4 with CD Rom. | 10-05518 | |
03/09/2010 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to File Fast Track Statement and Appendix. Due date: 10 days. (Notice is for FTS only.) | 10-06114 | |
03/15/2010 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Statement. Vol. 5. CD-ROM included. | 10-06832 | |
03/29/2010 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. | 10-08091 | |
03/30/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Granting Motion. The clerk of this court shall file the fast track statement received on March 29, 2010. Fast Track Response due: 20 days. | 10-08300 | |
03/30/2010 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Statement. | 10-08092 | |
04/14/2010 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Response. | 10-09778 | |
09/10/2010 | Order/Dispositional | Order Affirming in Part, Reversing in Part and Remanding. ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED IN PART AND REVERSED IN PART AND REMAND this matter to the district court for proceedings consistent with this order. | 10-23186 | |
10/06/2010 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 10-25946 | |
10/06/2010 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
10/19/2010 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on October 14, 2010. | 10-25946 |